Cellustar Corp. v. Sprint Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cellustar Corp.
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Corporation, Insurance Companies ABC and Company ABC
Counter Claimant: PR Wireless PR, LLC and DISH Wireless L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01559
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
2 Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Sprint Solutions, Inc. and PR Wireless PR, LLC's (jointly "Sprint") request to discover all communications and documents pertaining to the settlement agreement executed between Cellustar Corp. ("Cellustar") and DISH Wireless LLC ("DISH") in this litigation, including the contents of the settlement agreement (request #13). As the parties know, no court of appeals has ruled on the question of when and to what extent a party may compel the disclosure of a confidential settlement agreement between other parties to the litigation. See Quilez-Velar v. Ox Bodies, Inc. (D.P.R. Sept. 4, 2014). The First Circuit has noted, however, that there are two competing lines of cases on that question. Id. See Mathewson Corp. v. Allied Marine Indus., Inc., 827 F.2d 850, 852 n. 2 (1st Cir. 1987) (Selya, J.). In this case, the Court need not resolve the conflict between the two competing views because during the Motion Hearing held on August 30, 2022, the parties consented to having the Court independently review the settlement agreement in order to answer the question of whether the agreement included information concerning Cellustar's desire to withdraw from the market as a master agent and continue to act solely as a dealer. Upon review of the document, in camera, the Court can certify that the settlement agreement does not include any such information. As such, and without inferring or implying that the Court would have ordered the production of the confidential settlement agreement if it had included such information, there is simply no legitimate reason for the Court to even consider ordering the production of the confidential settlement agreement. Therefore, Sprint's request to compel the production of said document is DENIED. The Court's ruling, of course, does not prevent Sprint from attempting to obtain the desired information through other means of discovery. As to Sprint's request to produce the contents of settlement communications, the Court notes that the Sixth Circuit has recognized a "settlement privilege" protecting the contents of settlement negotiations. See Goodyear Tire & Rubber Corp. v. Chiles Power Supply, Inc., 332 F.3d 976, 981 (6th Cir. 2003). The Court is persuaded by the Sixth Circuit's reasoning that communications made in furtherance of settlement are privileged. In any event, even if settlement communications were not privileged, Sprint has not demonstrated that the requested statements are relevant to its case, especially in light of the fact that the information which Sprint hoped to find in the settlement agreement is not there. As such, Sprint's request to compel the production of settlement communications between Cellustar and DISH is also DENIED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER: Noted #205 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: #205 Motion In Compliance Submitting Confidential Document for In Camera Review. This motion is referred for disposition insofar as it seeks compliance with the minute and omnibus order at Docket Number 204 and for a report and recommendation insofar as it seeks attorney's fees and costs. ORDER REFERRING CASE to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for Scheduling and Settlement Conference as per minute and omnibus order at Docket Number 204. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 9/6/2022. (mcv)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ***EX-PARTE*** Motion In Compliance Submitting Confidential Document for In Camera Review as to #204 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Minute,, Omnibus Hearing,, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 9/19/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confidential Settlement Agreement)(Related document(s) #204 ) (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE AND OMNIBUS ORDER. Proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: A Motion Hearing was held on August 30, 2022. See the Court's Orders on the #175 Motion to Compel and the #180 Motion to Compel in the attached document. Hearing set for 09:00AM. Hearing held at 09:00AM. Hearing ended at 01:45PM. (GDM)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: Noted #201 Informative motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #201 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Supplemental Production of Documents to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for disposition since it is related to the matters referred at Docket Nos. #175 , #180 and the hearing set at Docket No. 200 . Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 8/30/2022.(mcv)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Supplemental Production of Documents filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 9/6/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' extensive briefing related to PR Wireless PR, LLC, and Sprint Solutions, Inc.'s #175 Motion to compel production of documents and Cellustar Corp's #180 Response in opposition thereto and Motion to compel discovery of information and documents. The Court understands that the parties and the Court would greatly benefit from having a hearing to discuss the ongoing discovery disputes raised in both motions. Accordingly, and per Judge Carreno-Colls' Order at Docket No. 191 , a Motion Hearing is hereby set for August 30, 2022, at 9:00AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER noted #198 Informative Motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 6/21/2022. (MEV)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Case Status filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. and Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/5/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria) Modified on 6/21/2022 to add filer and edit DE title (ecc).
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER noted #195 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 6/15/2022. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER: Granted #193 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status Motion in Compliance with Court Order No. 44 filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 5/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel) Modified on 4/20/2022 to add filer and edit DE title(ecc).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SURREPLY to Motion in Reply to Sprint's Response to Motion to Compel Discovery of Information and Documents filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Re: #180 MOTION to Compel filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-reply and Extension of Time until March 25, 2022 to File same filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 3/29/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria) Modified on 3/16/2022 to edit DE title(ecc).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll (Docket No.191), the #175 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and #180 Cellustar Motion to Compel Discovery have been randomly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for disposition. Signed by Clerk on 03/09/2022. (ft)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #175 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and #180 Cellustar Motion to Compel Discovery to U.S. Magistrate Judge at random for disposition. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 3/9/2022. (MCV)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 REPLY to Response to Motion Omnibus Response filed by Cellustar Corp. Re: #186 MOTION for Leave to File Document addressing Omnibus Response #184 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 8, 2022 to File Response/Reply as to #184 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by Cellustar Corp.. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER noted #188 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 2/22/2022. (MCV)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status and Docket No. 44 filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 3/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 2/22/2022 to add filers (ecc).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #186 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply and Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply/Surreply. Reply/Surreply due by 3/8/2022. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 2/17/2022. (MEV)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION for Leave to File Document addressing Omnibus Response #184 , MOTION for Extension of Time until March 8, 2022 to File Response/Reply as to #184 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 3/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #184 ) (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #176 Motion for Extension of Time; noted #177 INFORMATIVE motion; granting #178 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #179 Motion to Restrict; granting #179 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #181 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #182 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #183 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 2/15/2022. (MEV)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Opposition to Cellustar's Motion to Compel filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Re: #175 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 2/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 9, 2022 to File Response/Reply as to #180 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 2/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #180 ) (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply and Extension of Time to File Omnibus Motion to Address Both, the Reply and a Response to Cellustar's Motion to Compel filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 1/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Cellustar Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Cellustar Corp. Re: #175 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Cellustar Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unredacted version of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Letter 2021.11.29, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Interrogatories and RFP, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Answer to Interrogatories and RFP, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Objections, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - Supplemental Answers, #7 Exhibit Ex. F - Objections to Supplemental Answers, #8 Exhibit Ex. G - Deposition Notice, #9 Exhibit Ex. H - Letter 2021.07.28)(Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION to Restrict Document and, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 1/18/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION for extension of time until January 4, 2022 to file Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 1/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Discovery filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 1/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria) Modified on 12/21/2021 to add filer and edit DE title(ecc).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 29, 2021 to file Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 12/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 12/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER noted #173 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 10/21/2021. (MRB)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Court Order Dkt. 44 filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp, Spring Solutions, Inc. and PR Wireles PR LLC. Responses due by 11/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 10/19/2021 to add filers(ecc).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 PARTIAL JUDGMENT against DISH Wireless L.L.C. (DISH). Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 10/4/2021. (MCV)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER noted #170 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 10/04/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp., Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC and Dish Wireless LLC. Responses due by 9/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 8/19/2021 to add filers (ecc).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cellustar Corp., DISH Wireless L.L.C.. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER noted #166 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/08/2021. (MRB)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER noted #165 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/08/2021. (MRB)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status and Docket No. 44 filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 5/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 4/21/2021 to add filers (ecc).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Cellustar ANSWER to #159 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Counter Defendant Cellustar Corp..(Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Perez-Refojos terminated; denying #161 Motion to Alter Judgment. All the arguments in this motion to alter judgment/motion for reconsideration were considered by the Court; granting #162 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 4/7/2021. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 3/26/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Dish's Counterclaim re: #159 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by DISH Wireless L.L.C. filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 4/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #159 ) (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION to Alter or Amend Partial Judgment filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman) Modified on 3/31/2021 to correct motion title (ecc).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Daniel Perez-Refojos filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of DISH Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 3/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Defendant DISH Wireless L.L.C. D/B/A Boost Mobiles Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Amended Complaint and Counterclaims Against Plaintiff Cellustar Corp. ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Cellustar Corp. filed by Christian M. Echavarri-Junco on behalf of Counter Defendants Cellustar Corp., Cellustar Corp., Plaintiff Cellustar Corp..(Echavarri-Junco, Christian)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION AND ORDER denying #68 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #96 Supplemental Motion; granting in part and denying in part #127 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #134 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying #149 Supplemental Motion; denying #149 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot #155 Motion for Leave to File; noted #157 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 2/18/2021. (MCV) Modified on 2/19/2021 to add "Opinion and" (ab).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp.,Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC, ABC Company, Insurance Companies ABC and Dish Wireless, LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 2/19/2021 to include all parties (ecc).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER noted and granted #154 INFORMATIVE motion. The motion filed at Dk. No. #152 shall be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 2-11-2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 2/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Docket No. 152 filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 2/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Re: #149 Supplemental Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief re: #96 Supplemental Motion for Injunctive Relief (Alteration of Credit Terms) re: #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Rob MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ***STRICKEN AS PER DOCKET 152 ORDER***RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Re: #149 Supplemental Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief re: #96 Supplemental Motion for Injunctive Relief (Alteration of Credit Terms) re: #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Rob MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria) Modified on 2/12/2021 (ab).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Defendant Dish Wireless L.L.C. D/B/A Boost Mobile's Opposition to Plaintiff Cellustar Corp.'s Supplemental Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. filed by DISH Wireless L.L.C. Re: #149 Supplemental Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief re: #96 Supplemental Motion for Injunctive Relief (Alteration of Credit Terms) re: #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Rob MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by DISH Wireless L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/21/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Supplemental Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief re: #96 Supplemental Motion for Injunctive Relief (Alteration of Credit Terms) , #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C.A. 13(A)-(F), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 2/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inventory Allocation, #2 Exhibit Emails December 16, 2020, #3 Exhibit Promotion Information, #4 Exhibit Emails January 8, 2021)(Related document(s) #96 , #68 ) (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 1/21/2021 to delete repetive text (ecc).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion for Judgment in the Pleadings filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Re: #134 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 15, 2021 to File Response/Reply filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 1/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #138 Motion for extension of time; granting #140 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/7/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER noted #137 INFORMATIVE motion. Granting #137 request for a status conference, which will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/7/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #136 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/7/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Joinder. The remainder of the relief requested is under advisement. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/7/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER noted #132 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/7/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #129 Motion for voluntary dismissal of Just Cause Claim in Sprint's Counterclaim as to Sprint Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 1/7/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to File Document and Extension of Time to File Reply filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 1/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cellustar Corp. Re: #134 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Cellustar Corp.. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for extension of time until December 22, 2020 to file response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 1/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Discovery and Requesting Scheduling of Status Conference filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc., Cellular Corp., PR Wireless PR, LLC, Dish Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 12/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria) Modified on 12/16/2020 to add filers (mcm).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for extension of time until December 17, 2020 to file response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 12/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion to Join filed by Cellustar Corp. Re: #133 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Join Sprint Solutions, Inc.'s and PR Wireless PR LLC's Responses to Cellustar Corp.'s Motions for Injunctive Relief and Setting Forth Additional Grounds upon Which Such Request Should Be Denied Re: filed by DISH Wireless L.L.C. filed by Cellustar Corp.. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 12/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Join Sprint Solutions, Inc.'s and PR Wireless PR LLC's Responses to Cellustar Corp.'s Motions for Injunctive Relief and Setting Forth Additional Grounds upon Which Such Request Should Be Denied Re: #127 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Dish Wireless L.L.C. D/B/A Boost Mobile's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof. filed by DISH Wireless L.L.C., #106 Response to Motion,, filed by Sprint Corporation, PR Wireless PR, LLC, #78 MOTION Submitting Corrected Opposition re: #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of DISH Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 11/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #127 , #106 , #78 ) (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Joint Seventh INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 44 filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of All Defendants and Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 10/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria) Modified on 10/19/2020 to add filer (rom).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Cellustar Corp. Re: #127 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Dish Wireless L.L.C. D/B/A Boost Mobile's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof. filed by DISH Wireless L.L.C. filed by Cellustar Corp.. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CELLUSTAR'S ANSWER to #128 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Counter Defendant Cellustar Corp..(Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Joint MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Just Cause Claim in Sprint's Counterclaim as to Sprint Solutions, Inc. filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC, Cellustar Corp., DISH Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel) Modified on 9/14/2020 to add filers (rom).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint and Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Cellustar Corp. filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Plaintiff Cellustar Corp..(Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Dish Wireless L.L.C. D/B/A Boost Mobile's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof. filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of DISH Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #124 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #125 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/28/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Final MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2020 to File Answer to Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #95 Amended Complaint filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 9/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #95 ) (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Motion to allow Richard R. Olsen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6994884) filed by Christian M. Echavarri-Junco on behalf of DISH Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Echavarri-Junco, Christian)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Corporate Disclosure Statement byDISH Wireless L.L.C.. (Echavarri-Junco, Christian)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/24/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2020 to answer Amended Complaint or otherwise pelad. to File Answer filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of DISH Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 9/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #116 Motion requesting Order. The Motion for Permissive Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) is granted. In view of the Order at Dk. No. #119 , and the timetable provided therein, the Motion for Bifurcation of Claims under Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(b)is denied. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/12/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER to consolidate hearings. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 8/21/2020. (MCV)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER noted #117 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 8/18/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Sixth INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of Case in Compliance with Order filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/31/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION requesting Order Agreed Motion for Permissive Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and for Bifurcation of Claims under Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(b). filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of DISH Wireless L.L.C. Responses due by 8/31/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER noted #111 Opposition to Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/11/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying #109 Motion for Leave to File. The Court does not need further briefing. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/11/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER finding as moot #97 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/11/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER finding as moot #99 Motion to Compel in view of DK. No. #110 . Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 08/11/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to File Document Opposition to Motion for Leave to Reply filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 8/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Joint NOTICE of Agreement Regarding Motion to Compel Redesignation of Attorneys Eyes' Only Documents by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to File Document Short Reply (5) pages to Docket 106 filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 8/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #107 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/31/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for extension of time until August 6, 2020 to OPPOSE MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 8/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion Omnibus Response To Reply And Supplementary Motion Regarding Cellustars Request For Preliminary Injunction filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Corporation Re: #96 Supplemental Motion for Injunctive Relief (Alteration of Credit Terms) re: #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C.A. 13(A)-(F) filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 26, 2020 to File Answer to Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #95 Amended Complaint filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 8/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #95 ) (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/17/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for extension of time until July 30, 2020 to file omnibus response to Cellustar's reply and supplemental motion for preliminary injunction filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect date requested in the docket text (6/30/2020). To be corrected and re-filed.*** MOTION for extension of time until June 30, 2020 to file omnibus response to Cellustar's reply and supplemental motion for preliminary injunction filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel) Modified to file in error on 7/16/2020 (idg).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. Defendants have until 7/30/2020 to respond to DK. Nos. #96 , #97 and #99 . The Court will not entertain replies. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/16/2020.(Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. However, the Court will not entertain any further motions in excess of the page limit established by Local Rule 7(d). This applies to both parties. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/16/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #102 MOTION for extension of time until June 30, 2020 to file omnibus response to Cellustar's reply and supplemental motion for preliminary injunction. ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect date requested in the docket text (6/30/2020). To be corrected and re-filed.*** (idg)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Compel Redesignation of Documents Classified as Confidential-Attorneys'Eyes Only and Motion for Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2. Meet and Confer April 2020, #3 Exhibit 3. Meet and Confer May 2020, #4 Exhibit 4. Response from Sprint, #5 Exhibit 5. Sprint Objection, #6 Exhibit 6. Meet and Confer July 2020, #7 Exhibit 7. Example Allocation from Actify, #8 Exhibit 8. AEO Example A, #9 Exhibit 9. AEO Example B, #10 Exhibit 10. AEO Example C, #11 Exhibit 11. AEO Example D, #12 Exhibit 12. AEO Example E, #13 Exhibit 13. AEO Example F, #14 Exhibit 14. Additional Examples F, #15 Exhibit 15. AEO Example G, #16 Exhibit 16. AEO Example H, #17 Exhibit 17. AEO Example I)(Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Supplemental Motion for Injunctive Relief (Alteration of Credit Terms) re: #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C.A. 13(A)-(F) filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Company ABC, Insurance Companies ABC, PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., filed by Cellustar Corp..(Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/13/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 20, 2020 to File Response/Reply MOTION FOR LEAVE AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUR-REPLY as to #90 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #90 ) (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 07/06/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**REPLY to Response to Motion Sprint's Opposition to Injunctive Relief filed by Cellustar Corp. Re: #78 MOTION Submitting Corrected Opposition re: #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Cellustar Corp.. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Restrict Document Reply filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll:Status Conference held on 6/30/2020 via Teleconference. Present on behalf of plaintiff were Atty. Herman G. Colberg-Guerra and Atty. Christian A. Munoz-Lugo. On behalf of defendants were Atty. Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra and Atty. Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach. (ram)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/30/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Document Amended Complaint filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Complaint)(Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, however, the reply must comply with Local Rule 7 (c), it shall not exceed ten (10) pages in length and will be strictly confined to replying to new matters raised in the opposing memorandum. Rehashed arguments from the original request for preliminary injunction will not be considered. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/25/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 3, 2020 to File Response/Reply to Sprint's Opposition at #78 ; as to 83 Order on Motion Submitting, #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C.A. 13(A)-(F) filed by Cellustar Corp., #84 Order, filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 83 , #68 , #84 ) (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C.A. 13(A)-(F) filed by Cellustar Corp. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 6/25/2020. (MCV) (Main Document 84 replaced to correct page numbers on 6/25/2020) (idg).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER noted #78 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/22/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #79 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/22/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/22/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/22/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION Submitting Corrected Opposition re: #76 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Opposition (Exhibit 1))(Related document(s) #76 ) (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Restrict Document at Docket Number 76 filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Re: #68 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C.A. 13(A)-(F) filed by Cellustar Corp. filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER noted #73 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/17/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp., Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC. Responses due by 6/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 6/17/2020 to add filers (rom).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #70 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/12/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 06/12/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for extension of time until June 18, 2020 to REQUEST FOR TERM TO FILE OPPOSITION AND FOR POSTPONEMENT OF SCHEDULING OF HEARING UNTIL THE SAME IS SUBMITTED filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 6/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Restrict Document and extension for translation for exhibit filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 6/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to the Puerto Rico Dealers Act and Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C.A. 13(A)-(F) filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 6/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unredacted mot. for preliminary injunction, #2 Exhibit A - Let. to Sprnt 6-21-18, #3 Exhibit B - various letter July 2018, #4 Exhibit C December 2018 emails on allocation, #5 Exhibit D Dec. 2, 2018 allocation, #6 Exhibit D Dec. 9, 2018 allocation, #7 Exhibit D Dec. 16, 2018 allocation, #8 Exhibit D Dec. 23, 2018 allocation, #9 Exhibit D Dec. 30, 2018 allocation, #10 Exhibit E - emails December 2018 allocation, #11 Exhibit F - July 2019 allocation, #12 Exhibit G - July 2019 shipping label, #13 Exhibit H -NA-US- Prepaid Inventory May 3, 202, #14 Exhibit Inventory claim May 15, 2020, #15 Exhibit J Emails Inventory claim May 15, 2020, #16 Exhibit Sprint response Inventory claim May 21, 2020, #17 Exhibit L - Inventory Avaiability May 29, 2020)(Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll: Status/Telephone Conference held on 5/22/2020. A Further Status Conference is set for 6/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll via Teleconference. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will send an email with the call-in information. (ram)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Motion for extension of time; granting #64 Motion for a Hearing. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will send an email with the call-in information. Signed by Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 04/30/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia) Modified on 5/1/2020 to edit docket text (rom).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER noted #63 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 04/30/2020. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Joint MOTION for extension of time, MOTION for Hearing re 58 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, Order on Motion In Compliance,, filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp., Sprint Solutions, Inc., PR Wireless PR, LLC Responses due by 5/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 58 ) (Colberg-Guerra, Herman) Modified on 5/1/2020 to add filers (rom).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp., Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 4/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 4/16/2020 to add filer (rom).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 04/07/2020. (gr)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Granting #60 "Third Joint Informative Status Motion and in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 59." See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/18/2020. (MPL)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket 59 and to Inform of Status of Discovery filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 2/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Upon further review of the joint motion at Docket No. 57, the court must stand corrected. At Docket No. 58 it stated that the motion at Docket No. 57 is "unresponsive to the court's Order at Docket No. 56." The motion did respond to the court's order, addressing the issues on which the court requested information. Nevertheless, the court does not understand why the parties waited until December 30, 2019 to propose and/or start examining a Confidentiality Agreement. That said, the motion at Docket No. 57 is granted. Revised suggested deadlines for further discovery, and other filings, due on February 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/10/2020. (LMR)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: #57 "Joint Motion in Compliance with Court Order at Docket No. 56." The motion is unresponsive to the courts Order at Docket No. 56. Nevertheless, extension is authorized to produce documents by February 18, 2020. Initial review of them by March 5, 2020. Remaining deadlines extended 21 days. No further extensions will be granted unless extreme circumstances beyond the parties' reasonable control dictate otherwise. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/10/2020. (MPL)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Joint Motion In Compliance with Court Order at Docket No. 56 filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc, Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 2/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria) Modified on 2/11/2020 to add filer (gmm).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: #55 "Joint Motion Informing Delay in Discovery Proceedings, for Extension of Time and Requesting Leave to Submit Proposed Revised Discovery Schedule." On September 6, 2019, the court modified the Case Management Order to allow the parties additional time to conclude discovery (Docket No. 44). They are now asking the court to grant an additional extension to complete negotiations for a confidentiality agreement, and state that they will submit a proposed discovery schedule together with the next Joint Informative Motion due on February 17, 2020. The court does not understand why the parties have failed to agree on a "confidentiality agreement" (their joint motion is silent on this issue), which may suggest lack of diligence by one of the parties, some of the parties, or all parties. Before ruling on the request at Docket No. 55 and deciding whether to authorize further modifications to the discovery timetable, the court needs to know (i) what discovery has been conducted; and (ii) the sequence (including dates) regarding confidentiality agreement proposal(s) and counterproposal(s). The parties shall file a joint motion informing the court about these items not later than February 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/31/2020. (MPL)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 2/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Noting and granting #53 "Joint Informative Motion and for Withdrawal and Appearance of Legal Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/16/2020. (ebb)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Withdraw and Appearance of New Counsel Attorney as to Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 1/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Noting #51 "Second Joint Informative Motion Regarding Discovery Status." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/16/2019. (ebb)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Noting #49 "First Joint Informative Status Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/16/2019. (MPL)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery Status, Joint Motion In Compliance filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp., Sprint Solutions, Inc. and PR Wireless PR, LLC. Responses due by 10/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian) Modified on 10/16/2019 to add filers (mr).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Noting #47 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/1/2019. (MPL)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding first set of interrogatories and request for production of documents filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting #45 "Motion for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/27/2019. (EMJ)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 10/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Status Conference held on 9/6/2019. First Status Report due on October 15, 2019. September 13, 2019: Motion(s) for judgment on the pleadings; September 30, 2019: Written discovery; December 16, 2019: Response to written discovery; February 10, 2020: Written discovery pertaining to third parties; May 30, 2020: Conclusion of all factual witnesses discovery. See attached for additional deadlines. A follow up Status Conference will be held on 6/5/2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (LMR)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The follow up Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 3:00 p.m. is advanced for 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/26/2019.(LMR)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #35 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Counter Defendant Cellustar Corp., Plaintiff Cellustar Corp..(Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Granting #40 "Motion for Extension of Time." Responsive pleading due not later than August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/19/2019.(EMJ)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 23, 2019 to File Answer to Sprint Solutions Counterclaim re: #35 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc. filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 8/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: See attached. Deadline for Rule 26 disclosures: August 27, 2019. Deadline to amend the pleadings and to add parties: September 6, 2019. Motion(s) to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings: September 13, 2019. Conclusion of all discovery (including third party, factual and expert): February 13, 2020. Every 60 days, beginning on September 27, 2019, the parties shall file a Joint Motion informing the court of the status of discovery. Deadline to file motion(s) for summary judgment: March 16, 2020. Opposition(s) thereto: April 15, 2020. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to (i.e. opposition or reply). See Instructions pertaining to documents not in the English Language and courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2019. (ebb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Noting #37 "Joint Proposed Schedule." Case Management Order will follow. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2019. (ebb)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Joint Motion In Compliance with Order at Docket #36 - Joint Proposed Schedule filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 8/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/31/2019. (ebb)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Cellustar Corp. by Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Eddie Q. Morales-Rivera on behalf of Defendant PR Wireless PR, LLC.(Morales-Rivera, Eddie)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting #31 "Joint Motion for brief Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint." Appearing defendants shall answer the complaint by 7/26/2019. Thus, the motion at Docket No. #32 is moot.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/23/2019. (LMR)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Eddie Q. Morales-Rivera on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Rivera, Eddie)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting #29 "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action Against Sprint Corporation Pursuant to Fed. R. 41(a)(1)(A)(I)." Plaintiff's claims against Sprint Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (LMR)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to dismiss voluntarily without prejudice as to Sprint Corporation filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Granting #27 "Motion for Extension of Time." Sprint Corp. shall obtain and provide to Cellustar unsworn statement under penalty of perjury and Cellustar shall request voluntary dismissal not later than July 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/11/2019. (EMJ)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joint MOTION for extension of time until July 18, 2019 filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Sprint Corporation Responses due by 7/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman) Modified on 6/27/2019 to correct event (mr).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Supplemental Motion Regarding Corporate Disclosures re: #24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 7/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement bySprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPR Wireless PR, LLC. (Morales-Rivera, Eddie)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Noting #21 "Informative Motion re: No Remand and Demand for Jury Trial." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/25/2019. (LMR)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Removal and Demand for Trial by Jury filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting #18 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/20/2019. (LMR)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Christian A. Munoz-Lugo on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Lugo, Christian)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Initial Scheduling Conference held on 6/19/2019. See attached for deadlines. A follow up Status Conference will be held on September 6, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (LMR)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Noting #16 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/19/2019. (LMR)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Herman G. Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Cellustar Corp. Responses due by 7/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until Monday July 1st, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Eddie Q. Morales-Rivera on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC Responses due by 7/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Rivera, Eddie)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:In Chambers Conference held on 6/18/2019. The ISC is reset for tomorrow, June 19, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3. (LMR)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noting #12 "Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 11." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/14/2019.(EMJ)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion In Compliance with order at docket No. 11 as to 11 Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Order,, filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 6/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for Tuesday, June 18, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The parties shall come prepared to discuss their respective contentions. Defendants shall notify plaintiff with copies of all filings in this case (Docket Nos. 1 through 10), and of this Order. It shall also certify compliance not later than noontime on Friday, June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/12/2019. (EMJ)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion In Compliance with Court Order (Docket No. 7) filed by Eddie Q. Morales-Rivera on behalf of PR Wireless PR, LLC Responses due by 6/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Rivera, Eddie)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 6/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Documents and Certification per Docket No. 7 re: 7 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 6/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By 4:30 p.m. today, defendants (Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc. and P.R. Wireless) shall certify compliance with all removal requirements. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/11/2019.(LMR)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #3 "Motion Submitting." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (LMR)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc. (Colberg-Guerra, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Documents in Compliance with Notice re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 6/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/11/2019. (arg)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, Superior Section of San Juan, case number SJ2019CV04871. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6444164), filed by PR Wireless PR, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Rodriguez-Marxuach, Miguel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellustar Corp. v. Sprint Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: PR Wireless PR, LLC
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Eddie Q. Morales-Rivera
Represented By: Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DISH Wireless L.L.C.
Represented By: Christian M. Echavarri-Junco
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Richard R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellustar Corp.
Represented By: Herman G. Colberg-Guerra
Represented By: Christian A. Munoz-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?