Galarza-Pagan v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: MARIE IVETTE GALARZA-PAGAN
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv01569
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 8), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1569(MDM). Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/10/2019. (gr)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Because plaintiff has also consented (Docket No. 6), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/9/2019.(EMJ)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/9/2019. (EMJ)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Marie Ivette Galarza-Pagan. (Gonzalez-Ortiz, Nydia)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: See attached. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 7/8/2019.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/17/2019.(LMR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (vdm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by MARIE IVETTE GALARZA-PAGAN. (Gonzalez-Ortiz, Nydia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nydia Gonzalez-Ortiz on behalf of MARIE IVETTE GALARZA-PAGAN Responses due by 6/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Ortiz, Nydia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by MARIE IVETTE GALARZA-PAGAN. Service due by 9/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Gonzalez-Ortiz, Nydia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galarza-Pagan v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE IVETTE GALARZA-PAGAN
Represented By: Nydia Gonzalez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?