Cardenales-Ortiz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Leslie Cardenales-Ortiz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01570
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Submitting Prove Service of summons filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Leslie Cardenales-Ortiz Responses due by 8/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 6) this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1570(SCC). Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/18/2019. (gr)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Upon the parties' consent (Docket No. 3) the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/18/2019. (ebb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (vdm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Leslie Cardenales-Ortiz. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Leslie Cardenales-Ortiz (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6448590.), filed by Leslie Cardenales-Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenales-Ortiz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Cardenales-Ortiz
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?