Carrasquillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jose L Carrasquillo and Jose L. Carrasquillo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01579
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER noted #9 Motion submitting proof of service of summons. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 08/12/2019. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Submitting Prove Service of summons filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Jose L. Carrasquillo Responses due by 8/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 6), this case has been reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to conduct all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1579(SCC). Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2019. (gr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: This case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. sec 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/17/2019. (AGF)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office, Social Security Administration & U.S. Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jose L Carrasquillo. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Jose L Carrasquillo (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6454862.), filed by Jose L Carrasquillo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrasquillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L Carrasquillo
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Carrasquillo
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?