Diaz-Navarro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01594
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER noted #12 Motion submitting. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 8/7/2019. (cvr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Prove Service of summons filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro Responses due by 8/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 8), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1594(CVR). Judge Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 06/19/2019. (gr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct al proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/19/2019. (brc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/19/2019. (brc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro Responses due by 7/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz-Navarro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Luz Diaz-Navarro
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?