Ebury Street Capital, LLC et al v. McOsker et al
Plaintiff: Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, EB 2EMIALA, LLC, EB 1EMIALA, LLC and Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC
Defendant: LienClear - 0001, BCMG Technologies, LLC, LienClear, LLC, McOsker Holdings, LLC, BCMG International, LLC, LienClear - 0002, LLC, Echo Recovery Solutions, LLC, MAPPLUS, LLC, Bloxtrade, LLC, Stonewall Holdings, LLC, BCMG, LLC, Gricklegrass Farms, LLC, 100 Aker Wood, LLC, BCMG Services, LLC, CAMBISPR, LLC, Thomas R McOsker, LienClear - 0001, LLC and Thomas R. McOsker
Case Number: 3:2019cv01598
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/03/2019. (brc)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/03/2019. (brc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by EB 1EMIALA, LLC, EB 2EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by100 Aker Wood, LLC, BCMG International, LLC, BCMG Services, LLC, BCMG Technologies, LLC, BCMG, LLC, Bloxtrade, LLC, CAMBISPR, LLC, Echo Recovery Solutions, LLC, Gricklegrass Farms, LLC, LienClear - 0001, LLC, LienClear - 0002, LLC, LienClear, LLC, MAPPLUS, LLC, Thomas R. McOsker, McOsker Holdings, LLC, Stonewall Holdings, LLC. (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Hold In Abeyance Motion for Ex Parte Attachment to Secure Satisfaction of Judgment re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue as to All Defendants filed by 100 Aker Wood, LLC, Thomas R. McOsker, BCMG Technologies, LLC, BCMG, LLC, Stonewall Holdings, LLC, Gricklegrass Farms, LLC, MAPPLUS, LLC, Echo Recovery Solutions, LLC, BCMG Services, LLC, LienClear - 0001, LLC, Bloxtrade, LLC, BCMG International, LLC, LienClear, LLC, McOsker Holdings, LLC, LienClear - 0002, LLC, CAMBISPR, LLC, #4 MOTION for Writ of Attachment (Ex Parte) to Secure Satisfaction of Judgment filed by EB 1EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, EB 2EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC filed by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 7/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #5 , #4 ) (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue as to All Defendants filed by BCMG International, LLC, CAMBISPR, LLC, LienClear, LLC, McOsker Holdings, LLC, Stonewall Holdings, LLC, 100 Aker Wood, LLC, BCMG Services, LLC, Thomas R. McOsker, LienClear - 0002, LLC, Gricklegrass Farms, LLC, BCMG Technologies, LLC, Echo Recovery Solutions, LLC, MAPPLUS, LLC, LienClear - 0001, LLC, Bloxtrade, LLC, BCMG, LLC Responses due by 7/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Unsworn Statement Under Penalty of Perjury)(Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Writ of Attachment (Ex Parte) to Secure Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 100 Aker Wood, LLC, BCMG International, LLC, BCMG Services, LLC, BCMG Technologies, LLC, BCMG, LLC, Bloxtrade, LLC, CAMBISPR, LLC, Echo Recovery Solutions, LLC, Gricklegrass Farms, LLC, LienClear - 0001, LLC, LienClear - 0002, LLC, LienClear, LLC, MAPPLUS, LLC, Thomas R. McOsker, McOsker Holdings, LLC, Stonewall Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number PRX100064414) (arg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. Service due by 9/16/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Category Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct party as to whom the complaint is against(mcm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebury Street Capital, LLC et al v. McOsker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebury Street Capital, LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EB 2EMIALA, LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EB 1EMIALA, LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LienClear - 0001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCMG Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LienClear, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McOsker Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCMG International, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LienClear - 0002, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPPLUS, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloxtrade, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonewall Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCMG, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gricklegrass Farms, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100 Aker Wood, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCMG Services, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBISPR, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R McOsker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LienClear - 0001, LLC
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. McOsker
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?