Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd. v. Multinational Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd.
Defendant: Multinational Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01600
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until AUGUST 19, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Peter Diaz-Santiago on behalf of Multinational Life Insurance Company Responses due by 8/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Santiago, Peter)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk, re: D.E. #10 Application for Pro Hac Vice, ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF. Counsel to refile application with local counsels correct information*** (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** Motion to allow Hector Montalvo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6531540) filed by Peter Diaz-Santiago on behalf of Multinational Life Insurance Company Responses due by 8/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Diaz-Santiago, Peter) Modified on 8/8/2019 (mg).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 07/24/2019. (lir)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd. Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time until AUGUST 12, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Multinational Life Insurance Company filed by Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd.. (Post, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time until AUGUST 12, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Peter Diaz-Santiago on behalf of Multinational Life Insurance Company Responses due by 7/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Santiago, Peter) Modified on 7/12/2019 to add event. (mg).
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Multinational Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Multinational Life Insurance Company, filed by Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended, #2 Category Sheet Amended)(Post, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6460303.) re #1 Complaint filed by Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd., filed by Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd..(Post, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byHealthcare International Global Networks Ltd.. (Post, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Multinational Life Insurance Company, filed by Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd.. Service due by 9/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Post, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd. v. Multinational Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare International Global Networks Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Gordon Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multinational Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter Diaz-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?