Ramirez-de Arellano v. The Federal Aviation Administration
Plaintiff: JOSE A. RAMIREZ DE ARELLANO
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Petitioner: Jose A. Ramirez-de Arellano
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01607
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing filed by Carlos A. Mercado-Rivera on behalf of Jose A. Ramirez-de Arellano Responses due by 8/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Berry 6/25/19, #2 Exhibit William Barr 7/26/19)(Mercado-Rivera, Carlos)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action - Amended Complaint) (rim)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jose A. Ramirez-de Arellano, filed by Jose A. Ramirez-de Arellano. (Attachments: #1 Summons Exhibit)(Mercado-Rivera, Carlos)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Notice for Leave to File Amended Complaint: NOTED, and will be filed as a separate document no later than July 22, 2019. Request to issue summons is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/18/2019. (brc) Modified on 7/23/2019 to edit title of link (ab).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE for Leave to File Document against Jose A. Ramirez-de Arellano, filed by Jose A. Ramirez-de Arellano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Summons USA)(Mercado-Rivera, Carlos) Modified on 7/23/2019 to correct title and event (ab).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Aviation Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (ad)
June 21, 2019 New Civil Case Filing Fee Received $400.00, receipt number PRX100064459 (ad)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Carlos A. Mercado-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Summons FAA, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Category Sheet)(Mercado-Rivera, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-de Arellano v. The Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE A. RAMIREZ DE ARELLANO
Represented By: Carlos A. Mercado-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose A. Ramirez-de Arellano
Represented By: Carlos A. Mercado-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?