In the Matter of: Carlos A. Rodriguez-Quintana and Luz Marie Vazquez-Santiago
Appellant: Wilfredo Segarra Miranda
Interested Party: US Trustee
Appellee: Rushmore and RCAC-II
Case Number: 3:2019cv01620
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 7), this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 08/21/2019.(gr)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Transmittal Form. This case is transferred to the docket of District Judge Arias in exchange for case number 18-1896 which was transferred by him to my docket. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/21/2019. (brc)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File: GRANTED. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 8/12/2019. (grf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 29, 2019 to file defendants-appellees' briefs filed by Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano on behalf of Rushmore and RCAC-II Responses due by 8/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Wilfredo Segarra Miranda. Appellee Brief due by 8/19/2019. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Brief due by 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation and Statement of Issues, #2 Docket and Designated Items Adv 16-90, #3 Docket and Designated Items 15-07735, #4 Designated Claims 15-07735)(acbk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Wilfredo Segarra Miranda. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Apppeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 45, #3 Order dkt 46, #4 Order dkt 51, #5 Certified Docket)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of: Carlos A. Rodriguez-Quintana and Luz Marie Vazquez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wilfredo Segarra Miranda
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rushmore and RCAC-II
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?