The Workforce Development Area of Northwest v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: The Workforce Development Area of Northwest
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, PRESIDENT OF THE STATE WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARD IN ITS OFFICIAL CAPACITY, SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND COMMERCE, GOVERNOR OF THE COMMONWEALTH PUERTO RICO, Ricardo Rosello-Nevarez, Manuel Laboy-Rivera, Emilio Colon-Zabala and Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Case Number: 3:2019cv01621
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Emilio Colon-Zabala, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Manuel Laboy-Rivera, Wanda Vazquez-Garced. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons for Governor re #1 Complaint, filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons for Manuel Laboy re #1 Complaint, filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons for Emilio Colon re #1 Complaint, filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico re #1 Complaint, filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Plaintiffs shall take note for further reference that the #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order does not appear to have been served upon Defendants. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/5/2019. (LAD)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The Plaintiff's #6 Motion for extension of time is GRANTED, as the translations were filed within the extension of time requested. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/5/2019. (LAD)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents is NOTED and GRANTED. However, the Court cannot consider the exhibits until they are submitted in translated form. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 7/31/2019. (nat)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The #4 and #7 Motions Submitting are NOTED. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 7/31/2019. (nat)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denied #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denied #8 Motion Restating Request for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 7/31/2019. (mld)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsworn Declaration)(Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest, #1 Complaint, filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of The Workforce Development Area of Northwest Responses due by 7/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #2 , #1 ) (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until July 11, 2019 to file certified translations filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of The Workforce Development Area of Northwest Responses due by 7/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Submitting Category Sheet and Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint, filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of The Workforce Development Area of Northwest Responses due by 7/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of The Workforce Development Area of Northwest Responses due by 7/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of The Workforce Development Area of Northwest Responses due by 7/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6474934.), filed by The Workforce Development Area of Northwest. Service due by 9/25/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Workforce Development Area of Northwest v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Workforce Development Area of Northwest
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESIDENT OF THE STATE WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARD IN ITS OFFICIAL CAPACITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND COMMERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR OF THE COMMONWEALTH PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Rosello-Nevarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Laboy-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Colon-Zabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Vazquez-Garced
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?