Marcano-Negron v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lydia M. Marcano-Negron
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01627
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 8), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings and entry of a final judgment. All pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1627 (BJM). Judge Besosa is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2019. (gr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge: NOTED. This case is referred to a magistrate judge for all further proceedings, to include the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/09/2019. (brc)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: NOTED. This case is referred to a magistrate judge for all further proceedings, to include the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/09/2019. (brc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lydia M. Marcano-Negron. (De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)
July 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION of Consent by Lydia M. Marcano-Negron. (De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit title and event (ab).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT. No later than July 8, 2019, plaintiff will inform the Court whether she consents to have all proceedings handled by a magistrate judge, to include the entry of judgment. Failure to do so will be considered implicit consent. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/02/2019. (brc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S Attorneys Office, U.S. Attorney General & Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Lydia M. Marcano Negron against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6477001.), filed by Lydia M. Marcano-Negron. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, San Juan, PR, #4 Summons Office of Attorney General of the US, Washington, DC, #5 Summons Social Security Administration, New York, NY, #6 Summons Commissioner of SS, Baltimore, MD)(De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcano-Negron v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia M. Marcano-Negron
Represented By: Louis A. De Mier-LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?