Abislaiman et al v. Delgatto, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chris Delgatto and Julio Abislaiman
Defendant: Delgatto, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01633
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Julio Abislaiman upon All Defendants., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julio Abislaiman (Lebron-Ramirez, Walter) Modified on 8/9/2019 remove restriction (gav).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 First NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Walter P. Lebron-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lebron-Ramirez, Walter) Modified on 8/9/2019 remove restriction (gav).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chris Delgatto, Delgatto, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Delgatto, Delgatto, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6478953.), filed by Julio Abislaiman. Service due by 9/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons Delgatto Inc, #5 Summons Chris Delgatto)(Vicente-Colon, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abislaiman et al v. Delgatto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Delgatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Abislaiman
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Walter P. Lebron-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delgatto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?