e-STEPS, LLC v. Americas Leading Finance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: e-STEPS, LLC
Defendant: Jane Doe, Conjugal Partnership Garcia - Roe, Luis O'Farril, John Doe, Victor Garcia Porrata, Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Jane Roe, Conjugal Partnership O'Farril - Roe, Conjugal Partnership Acum-Doe, TRAKSECURE, CORP., Conjugal partnership Kogan-Doe, Nicolas Kogan, Susan Roe, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Roe, Conjugal Partnership O'Farril-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Acum and Victor Garcia-Porrata
Case Number: 3:2019cv01637
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/6/2019 to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 30, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Krystal Santiago-Sanchez filed by Krystal Santiago-Sanchez on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santiago-Sanchez, Krystal)
August 21, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Document - Reply in Support of the ALF Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, with Tendered Reply filed by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan Responses due by 9/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
August 19, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to #5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Pedro J. Rivera-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Draft Reply)(Rivera-Rivera, Pedro) Modified to add relationship on 8/20/2019 (idg).
August 16, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ernesto Rovira-Gandara on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Roe, Conjugal Partnership O'Farril-Roe, Victor Garcia-Porrata, Luis O'Farril, Traksecure, Corp. Responses due by 8/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rovira-Gandara, Ernesto)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by e-STEPS, LLC Re: #18 MOTION to dismiss Complaint as to All Plaintiffs filed by Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan filed by e-STEPS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 Second MOTION for extension of time until 8/14/2019 to Oppose Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Pedro J. Rivera-Rivera on behalf of e-STEPS, LLC Responses due by 8/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
August 8, 2019 Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan Re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by e-STEPS, LLC filed by Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
August 2, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/9/2019 to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #29 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/9/2019 to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** (mcm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel Filed in legal format.*** MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/9/2019 to file Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 8/2/2019 (mcm).
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION Submitting submitting translated documents re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents MOTION for extension of time filed by Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan Responses due by 8/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro)
July 29, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance and Extension of Time by Ernesto Rovira-Gandara on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Roe, Conjugal Partnership O'Farril-Roe, Victor Garcia-Porrata, Luis O'Farril, Traksecure, Corp. (Rovira-Gandara, Ernesto) Modified to add event on 7/30/2019 (idg).
July 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia C. Albors-Agullo on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan (Albors-Agullo, Natalia)
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification), filed by e-STEPS, LLC.(Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #24 Report on Filing of Copyright Action. ***FILED IN ERROR- PDF filed in a fillable format. Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 ***FILED IN ERROR- PDF filed in a fillable format. Counsel to re-file.*** REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification), filed by e-STEPS, LLC.(Vissepo-Garriga, Jean) Modified to file in error on 7/24/2019 (idg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance - Notice of Appearance and Request to Receive Notifications by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan (Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystal Santiago-Sanchez on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan (Santiago-Sanchez, Krystal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance - Notice of Appearance and Request to Receive Notifications by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time until August 8, 2019 to file Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents, MOTION for extension of time filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan. Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro). Added event on 7/24/2019 (idg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss Complaint as to All Plaintiffs filed by Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa on behalf of Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Nicolas Kogan Responses due by 8/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Conjugal Partnership O'Farril-Roe served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Luis O'Farril served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Roe served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Victor Garcia-Porrata served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Traksecure, Corp. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Conjugal partnership Kogan-Doe served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Jane Doe served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Nicolas Kogan served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by e-STEPS, LLC upon Carola Acum served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: This case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. Upon attaining senior status, Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory does not accept cases where injunctive relief is sought; the original case assignment was thus erroneous. Accordingly, Judge Garcia-Gregory is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2019. (gr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Americas Leading Finance, LLC served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro J. Rivera-Rivera on behalf of e-STEPS, LLC (Rivera-Rivera, Pedro)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carola Acum, Americas Leading Finance, LLC, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Acum, Conjugal Partnership Garcia - Roe, Conjugal Partnership O'Farril - Roe, Conjugal partnership Kogan-Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe, Victor Garcia Porrata, Nicolas Kogan, Luis O'Farril, Jane Roe, Susan Roe, TRAKSECURE, CORP. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance as Counsel filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit docket text(ab).
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6481961.), filed by e-STEPS, LLC. Service due by 9/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: e-STEPS, LLC v. Americas Leading Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Garcia - Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis O'Farril
Represented By: Ernesto Rovira-Gandara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Garcia Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carola Acum
Represented By: Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano
Represented By: Natalia C. Albors-Agullo
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Krystal Santiago-Sanchez
Represented By: Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americas Leading Finance, LLC
Represented By: Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano
Represented By: Natalia C. Albors-Agullo
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Krystal Santiago-Sanchez
Represented By: Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership O'Farril - Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Acum-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAKSECURE, CORP.
Represented By: Ernesto Rovira-Gandara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal partnership Kogan-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Kogan
Represented By: Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano
Represented By: Natalia C. Albors-Agullo
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Krystal Santiago-Sanchez
Represented By: Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Roe
Represented By: Ernesto Rovira-Gandara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership O'Farril-Roe
Represented By: Ernesto Rovira-Gandara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Acum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Garcia-Porrata
Represented By: Ernesto Rovira-Gandara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: e-STEPS, LLC
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Pedro J. Rivera-Rivera
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?