Rivera-Figueroa v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jose J. Rivera-Figueroa
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01638
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General & Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re #2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Jose J. Rivera-Figueroa, Pro se. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (gmm)
August 1, 2019 Partial Filing Fee Received $80.00, receipt number PRX100065154 (RE: DKT. 3) (rim)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Denying #1 "Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." Having considered petitioner's affidavit in support of the motion, the request is DENIED. Petitioner, however, is authorized to pay the filing fee in five (5) monthly installments of $80.00, due the first Friday of every month, beginning on August 2, 2019. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/15/2019. (EMJ)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Jose J. Rivera-Figueroa, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(mr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose J. Rivera-Figueroa, pro se. Responses due by 7/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Figueroa v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose J. Rivera-Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?