Rodriguez-Gonzalez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Israel Rodriguez-Gonzalez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01643
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 4), this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1643(BJM). Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2019. (gr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: This case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. sec 636. Plaintiff consented as such in the complaint (Docket No. 1). Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/9/2019. (AGF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (vdm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6484067.), filed by Israel Rodriguez-Gonzalez. Service due by 10/3/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons Attorney Gen, #5 Summons Social Security, #6 Appendix No Change of Address)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel) Modified on 7/8/2019 to remove restriction placed by filer (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Gonzalez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Rodriguez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?