Rivas-Colon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sara Marie Rivas-Colon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01645
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1645(SCC). Judge Dominguez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/10/2019. (gr)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for final disposition. Based upon the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636; Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; and the consent of the parties, this case is now referred to the Clerk to assign the instant matter to a Magistrate Judge at random. The Social Security Administration has consented to have all social security cases brought before a Magistrate Judge. Moreover, Plaintiff has also consented to have this case brought before a Magistrate Judge at Docket Entry 5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/10/2019.(MES)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sara Marie Rivas-Colon. (De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court reminds the parties that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. 28 U.S.C.A. 636(c). The Social Security Administration has consented to have all social security cases brought before a Magistrate Judge. This procedure could prove to be more expeditious, and therefore, less expensive, than a trial before a District Judge. The Plaintiff is, of course, also free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2). The Plaintiff is advised, however, that the increase in the Courts criminal docket may impede a reasonably timely disposition of this case. Hence, The Court hereby orders the Plaintiff to affirmatively state whether or not he consents to having the instant matter be entertained before a U.S. Magistrate Judge through the entry of judgement and his rationale underlying his decision on or before July 15, 2019. Failure to respond to this Order will be treated as an implied consent by the Plaintiff. The Court notes that the Magistrate Judges in the District of Puerto Rico are first-rate jurists with impeccable legal minds, integrity and judicial temperament. The Plaintiff should thus carefully consider the merits of consenting to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/8/2019.(MES)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (vdm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Sara Marie Rivas-Colon against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6484059.), filed by Sara Marie Rivas-Colon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, San Juan, PR, #4 Summons Office of Attorney General of the U.S., #5 Summons Social Security Administration, #6 Summons Commissioner of SS, Baltimore, MD)(De Mier-LeBlanc, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivas-Colon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Marie Rivas-Colon
Represented By: Louis A. De Mier-LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?