Pagan-Caraballo et al v. Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA et al

Plaintiff: Henry Pagan-Perez, Juan Pagan-Caraballo, XYZ Insurance Co., Carmen Perez-Quintana and Steven Pagan-Perez
Defendant: Ricardo L Fernandez, Jorge A Dulzaides-Gonzalez, Mrs. Fernandez, Mrs. Dulzaides, Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA, Mrs. FNU Fernandez, Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Dulzaides-Doe and Mrs. FNU Dulzaides
Case Number: 3:2019cv01649
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting as requested #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/30/2019. (LE)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/13/2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings filed by Karena Montes-Berrios on behalf of Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Montes-Berrios, Karena)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henry Pagan-Perez, Carmen Perez-Quintana, Juan Pagan-Caraballo, Steven Pagan-Perez. Conjugal Partnership Dulzaides-Doe waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; FNU Dulzaides waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Jorge A Dulzaides-Gonzalez waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; FNU Fernandez waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Ricardo L Fernandez waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Waivers) (Pedrosa-Luna, Hector)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time as Requested. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/31/2019. (LE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time until August 30, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA Responses due by 8/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/17/2019. (LE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to allow Frank Torres-Viada to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6496729) filed by Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pedrosa-Luna, Hector) Modified on 7/16/2019 to correct event and title (gmm).
July 12, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #7 Motion to allow Frank Torres-Viada to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6496729). ***FILED IN ERROR. Lacking Local Counsel's Electronic Signature. Counsel to re-file*** (gmm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR-LACKING LOCAL COUNSEL ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE*** Motion to allow Frank Torres-Viada to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6496729) filed by Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pedrosa-Luna, Hector) Modified on 7/15/2019 (gmm).
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Dulzaides-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe, Jorge A Dulzaides-Gonzalez, Ricardo L Fernandez, Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA, XYZ Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/9/2019. (gmm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Pedrosa-Luna, Hector)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (vdm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6484122.), filed by Henry Pagan-Perez, Carmen Perez-Quintana, Juan Pagan-Caraballo, Steven Pagan-Perez. Service due by 10/3/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pedrosa-Luna, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagan-Caraballo et al v. Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo L Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge A Dulzaides-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Dulzaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Farm Credit, ACA
Represented By: Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano
Represented By: Karena Montes-Berrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. FNU Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Dulzaides-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. FNU Dulzaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Pagan-Perez
Represented By: Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
Represented By: Frank Torres-Viada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pagan-Caraballo
Represented By: Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
Represented By: Frank Torres-Viada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XYZ Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Perez-Quintana
Represented By: Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
Represented By: Frank Torres-Viada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Pagan-Perez
Represented By: Hector E. Pedrosa-Luna
Represented By: Frank Torres-Viada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?