Wiscovitch-Rentas v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano, Jose Acosta-Grubb, Conjugal Partnership Bimbela-Aldebol, Janet Navarrete, Maria I. Santos-Rivera, Emily Arean, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete, Diana Lozano, Jane Doe, Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Reyes, Jose A. Sosa-Llorens, Charles A. Bimbela, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Deal, Maria Santos, Waleska Mora-Aldebol, Juan C. Perez-Otero, Pedro Manzano-Yates, Eduardo Negron-Navas, Carmen Juarbe, Mary Deal, Aon Risk Solutions of Puerto Rico, Inc., Conjugal Partnership Perez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe, Conjugal Partnership Arean-Negron, Jose A. Silva-Cofresi, Conjugal Partnership Santos-Ortiz, Vivian Reyes, Jose Julian Alvarez and Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon
Debtor: Fiddler Gonzalez & Rodriguez, P.S.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01651
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #15 Reply to Response to Motion. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (gav)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (gav)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** REPLY to Response to Motion Bankr. Dkt. Nos. 98,99,101,104,157 and District Court Dkt. Nos. 2,3, 4,5, 6, 7,8, 9,10 and 11 filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Re: #9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission and Request for Issuance of CM/ECF Credentials filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jose A. Sosa-Llorens, Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano, #11 MOTION for Joinder to Oppositions to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Jose A. Sosa-Llorens, #3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding /MOTION TO INFORM PENDING OBJECTION TO JURY TRIAL BEFORE BANKRUPTCY COURT/ filed by Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete, Pedro Manzano-Yates, Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe, Carmen Juarbe, Jose A. Silva-Cofresi, Janet Navarrete, #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Opposition to Jury Demand and Request for Withdrawal of the Reference and Request for Hearing Thereon filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #4 MOTION for Joinder filed by Maria I. Santos-Rivera filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement CM/ECF Recipients)(Wiscovitch-Rentas, Noreen) Modified on 9/3/2019 (gav).
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas on behalf of Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Wiscovitch-Rentas, Noreen) Modified on 9/3/2019 (gav).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of Judge William G. Young. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/30/2019.(ft)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss as to Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Jose A. Sosa-Llorens Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Joinder to Oppositions to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Jose A. Sosa-Llorens Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw filed by Jose Julian Alvarez, Charles A. Bimbela, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Deal, Mary Deal Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Jose Julian Alvarez, Charles A. Bimbela, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Deal, Mary Deal. (Sosa-Baez, Angel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission and Request for Issuance of CM/ECF Credentials filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Responses due by 8/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) Modified on 8/1/2019 to remove caps (rom).
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Opposition to Jury Demand and Request for Withdrawal of the Reference and Request for Hearing Thereon filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance and to Request Second and Final Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead, Oppose Jury Trial, Oppose Withdrawal of the Reference and/or any Other Matter or Deadline that Become Due Counted From the Issuance of Summons by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano, Jose A. Sosa-Llorens (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit event (rom).
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference filed by Emily Arean, Conjugal Partnership Arean-Negron, Eduardo Negron-Navas Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Emily Arean, Conjugal Partnership Arean-Negron, Eduardo Negron-Navas. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference filed by Jose Acosta-Grubb Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Jose Acosta-Grubb. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Joinder to Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference (Dockets #1 & 2) filed by Maria I. Santos-Rivera Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Maria I. Santos-Rivera. (Delgado-Miranda, Briseida) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit event (rom).
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pending Objection to Jury Trial Before Bankruptcy Court filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe, Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete, Carmen Juarbe, Pedro Manzano-Yates, Janet Navarrete, Jose A. Silva-Cofresi Responses due by 8/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Torres, Carmen) Modified on 7/24/2019 to remove caps (rom).
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference filed by Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon. (Delgado-Miranda, Briseida)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal to District Court of Withdrawal of Reference. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Docket 1, #4 Docket 3, #5 Docket 4, #6 Docket 5, #7 Docket 6, #8 Docket 7, #9 Docket 8, #10 Docket 9, #11 Docket 10, #12 Docket 11, #13 Docket 12, #14 Docket 13, #15 Docket 14, #16 Docket 15, #17 Docket 16, #18 Docket 17, #19 Docket 18, #20 Docket 19, #21 Docket 20, #22 Docket 21, #23 Docket 22, #24 Docket 23, #25 Docket 24, #26 Docket 25, #27 Docket 26, #28 Docket 27, #29 Docket 28, #30 Docket 29, #31 Docket 30, #32 Docket 31, #33 Docket 34, #34 Docket 35, #35 Docket 36, #36 Docket 37, #37 Docket 38, #38 Docket 39, #39 Docket 40, #40 Docket 41), #41 Docket 42, #42 Docket 43, #43 Docket 44, #44 Docket 45, #45 Docket 46, #46 Docket 47, #47 Docket 48, #48 Docket 49 #49, Docket 50, #50 Docket 51, #51 Docket 52, #52 Docket 53, #53 Docket 54, #54 Docket 55, #55 Docket 56, #56 Docket 57, #57 Docket 58, #58 Docket 59, #59 Docket 60, #60 Docket 61, #61 Docket 62, #62 Docket 85, #63 Docket 87, #64 Docket 88, #65 Docket 89, #66 Docket 90, #67 Docket 92, #68 Docket 93, #69 Docket 94, #70 Docket 98, #71 Docket 99, #72 Docket 101, #73 Docket 102, #74 Docket 103, #75 Docket 104, #76 Docket 105, #77 Docket 106, #78 Docket 107, #79 Docket 108, #80 Docket 109, #81 Docket 111, #82 Docket 100) (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiscovitch-Rentas v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas
Represented By: Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas
Represented By: Javier Vilarino-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano
Represented By: Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Acosta-Grubb
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Bimbela-Aldebol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Navarrete
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria I. Santos-Rivera
Represented By: Briseida Delgado-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Arean
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete
Represented By: Luisa S. Valle-Castro
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Lozano
Represented By: Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Reyes
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Sosa-Llorens
Represented By: Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Bimbela
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Angel Sosa-Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Deal
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Angel Sosa-Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waleska Mora-Aldebol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan C. Perez-Otero
Represented By: Jorge I. Peirats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Manzano-Yates
Represented By: Luisa S. Valle-Castro
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Negron-Navas
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Juarbe
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Deal
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Angel Sosa-Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Risk Solutions of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Perez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe
Represented By: Luisa S. Valle-Castro
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Arean-Negron
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Silva-Cofresi
Represented By: Luisa S. Valle-Castro
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Santos-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Reyes
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Julian Alvarez
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Angel Sosa-Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon
Represented By: Briseida Delgado-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Fiddler Gonzalez & Rodriguez, P.S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?