Micheo-Acevedo v. Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marisol Micheo Acevedo, F and Marisol Micheo-Acevedo
Defendant: Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01652
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to allow Ethan Balsam to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6530157) filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Sanctions (Renewed) Under Rule 11 as to Marisol Micheo-Acevedo filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-July 2019 Letter, #2 Exhibit B-August 2,2019 letter)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint and for Sanctions as to Marisol Micheo-Acevedo filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Motion for Sanctions)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk, re: D.E. #17 MOTION to Dismiss and D.E. #18 MOTION for Sanctions, ***FILED IN ERROR: Motions Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (mg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** MOTION for Sanctions (Renewed) Under Rule 11 as to Marisol Micheo-Acevedo filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-July 19, 2019 letter, #2 Exhibit B-August 2, 2019 letter)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro) Modified on 8/26/2019 (mg).
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint and for Sanctions as to Marisol Micheo-Acevedo filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 9/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Motion for Sanctions)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro) Modified on 8/26/2019 (mg).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER noted #15 Motion requesting Order; finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #13 Motion for Sanctions. In light of the filing of an amended complaint, Docket No. #14 , Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions are hereby FOUND AS MOOT. Defendant may refile these motions, if needed, in response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/21/2019. (MQ)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION requesting Order to Hold in Abeyance Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions filed by Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz on behalf of Marisol Micheo-Acevedo Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc., filed by Marisol Micheo-Acevedo.(Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 as to Marisol Micheo-Acevedo filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-Rule 11 Letter to Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2-August 2, 2019 Letter)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING AND SETTING ASIDE 11 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/12/2019. (MQ)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***VACATED AND SET ASIDE AS PER D.E. #12 ORDER*** ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 08/12/2019. (lir) Modified on 8/13/2019 (mg).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Recusal. None of the parties in Civ. No. 17-1083 is a blood relative of the undersigned and, thus, there is no basis for recusal. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/6/2019. (MQ)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Brief)(Buso-Garcia, Pedro) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit re-open motion as per D.E. 11 vacated order. (mg).
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR improper applicant signature.*** Motion to allow Ethan D. Balsam to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6530157) filed by Pedro A. Buso-Garcia on behalf of Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 8/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Buso-Garcia, Pedro) Modified on 8/8/2019 (mg).
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Recusal under 28 U.S.C. 455(a) filed by Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz on behalf of Marisol Micheo-Acevedo Responses due by 8/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 4), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 07/18/2019. (ft)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marisol Micheo-Acevedo upon Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This case is transferred to the docket of Judge Garcia-Gregory, in exchange for case number 18-066. Judge Garcia-Gregory has consented to the transfer and exchange. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/18/2019. (brc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6488902.), filed by Marisol Micheo Acevedo, F. Service due by 10/7/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Gonzalez-Munoz, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micheo-Acevedo v. Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stericycle of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Pedro A. Buso-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Micheo Acevedo, F
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Micheo-Acevedo
Represented By: Juan R. Gonzalez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?