Mora-Santiago v. Janssen Ortho, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Mora Santiago and Maria T. Mora-Santiago
Defendant: Mrs. Mariam Ortiz, Janssen Ortho, LLC, Mrs. Anaris Garcia, Companies XYZ, Jane Does, Insurance Company ABC and John Does
Case Number: 3:2019cv01657
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Camelia S. Ramos-Freese on behalf of Defendant Janssen Ortho, LLC.(Ramos-Freese, Camelia)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #9 "Motion for Extension of Time." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/30/2019. (EMJ)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Maria T. Mora-Santiago filed by Maria V. Munera-Pascual on behalf of Anaris Garcia Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Munera-Pascual, Maria)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #7 "Motion for Extension of Time." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/14/2019.(EMJ)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 13, 2019 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Maria T. Mora-Santiago filed by Maria V. Munera-Pascual on behalf of Mariam Ortiz Responses due by 8/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Munera-Pascual, Maria)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Motion for Extension of Extension of Time." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/8/2019. (EMJ)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 6, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Maria T. Mora-Santiago filed by Camelia S. Ramos-Freese on behalf of Janssen Ortho, LLC Responses due by 8/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Freese, Camelia)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anaris Garcia, Janssen Ortho, LLC, Mariam Ortiz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by Maria Teresa Mora Santiago (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with summons) (Vega-Quintana, Monica)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6490328.), filed by Maria Teresa Mora Santiago. Service due by 10/8/2019,(Vega-Quintana, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora-Santiago v. Janssen Ortho, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Mariam Ortiz
Represented By: Maria V. Munera-Pascual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho, LLC
Represented By: Camelia S. Ramos-Freese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Anaris Garcia
Represented By: Maria V. Munera-Pascual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companies XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Mora Santiago
Represented By: Monica L. Vega-Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria T. Mora-Santiago
Represented By: Monica L. Vega-Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?