Ortiz-Romero v. Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Ortiz-Romero
Defendant: Christian Sobrino-Vega, Alejandro Camporeales and Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv01659
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariela Rexach-Rexach on behalf of Alejandro Camporeales, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority, Christian Sobrino-Vega (Rexach-Rexach, Mariela)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of Defendants Alejandro Camporeales, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority, Christian Sobrino-Vega.(Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Plaintiff's Disparate Impact Claim of Age Discrimination filed by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by all Plaintiffs upon all Defendants. (gav)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/17/2019. (EES)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alejandro Camporeales, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority and Christian Sobrino-Vega. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Pedro Ortiz-Romero, Pro se. Responses due by 7/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pedro Ortiz-Romero, Pro se. Service due by 10/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Case law, #23 Case law, #24 Case law)(gav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz-Romero v. Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Sobrino-Vega
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Represented By: Mariela Rexach-Rexach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Camporeales
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Represented By: Mariela Rexach-Rexach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Represented By: Mariela Rexach-Rexach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Ortiz-Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?