Del Rio Loranca v. Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Flor T. Del Rio Loranca
Defendant: Agustin Arellano-Rodriguez, Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC and Maria Roman-Santos
Case Number: 3:2019cv01660
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Enrique R. Padro on behalf of Defendant Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC.(Padro, Enrique)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Answer deadline due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/23/2019. (rom)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Answer deadline due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/22/2019. (gmm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Flor T. Del Rio Loranca filed by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Maria Roman-Santos Responses due by 9/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez on behalf of Maria Roman-Santos (Aponte-Gonzalez, Ivan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 19, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Flor T. Del Rio Loranca filed by Manuel Porro-Vizcarra on behalf of Agustin Arellano-Rodriguez Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Porro-Vizcarra, Manuel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flor T. Del Rio Loranca upon Maria Roman-Santos served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Monserrate, Dora)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flor T. Del Rio Loranca upon Agustin Arellano-Rodriguez served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Monserrate, Dora)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 9/1/2019. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/26/2019. (wm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Enrique R. Padro on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC (Padro, Enrique)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 1, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte on behalf of Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC Responses due by 7/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Ugarte, Nicole)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC, Agustin Arellano-Rodriguez, Flor T. Del Rio Loranca (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6492110.), filed by Flor T. Del Rio Loranca. Service due by 10/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Exhibit Change of Address, #5 Exhibit Change of Address, #6 Summons Aerostar, #7 Summons Agustin Arrellano, #8 Summons Mara Roman)(Monserrate, Dora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rio Loranca v. Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Arellano-Rodriguez
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerostar Airport Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Enrique R. Padro
Represented By: Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Roman-Santos
Represented By: Ivan E. Aponte-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor T. Del Rio Loranca
Represented By: Dora L. Monserrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?