Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC v. Betterecycling Corporation
Appellant: Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC
Appellee: Betterecycling Corporation
Interested Party: U.S. Trustee, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico and Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2019cv01662
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #13 MOTION for extension of time until September 10, 2019 to file Appellant's Brief. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number.*** (idg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number.*** MOTION for extension of time until September 10, 2019 to file Appellant's Brief filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 9/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) Modified to file in error on 9/3/2019 (idg).
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Appellant Brief due by 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Contents, #2 Appellant's Statement of Issues, #3 4 1 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part1, #4 4 2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part2, #5 4 3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part I_Part3, #6 5 1 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part1, #7 5 2 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part2, #8 5 3 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part3, #9 5 4 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part4, #10 5 5 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part5, #11 5 6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part6, #12 5 7 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part7, #13 5 8 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part8, #14 5 9 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part9, #15 5 10 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part10, #16 5 11 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part11, #17 5 12 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part12, #18 5 13 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part II Dkt 283_Part13, #19 6 Appellant's Record on Appeal Part III, #20 7 Certified Docket)(babk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion : MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY TO OBJECTION TO URGENT MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL AND TENDERING REPLY filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Re: #5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Intent to Respond filed by Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico, Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court re: Notice of Docket Text Modification, #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to Puerto Rico Asphalt's Allegedly Urgent Motion for Stay Pending Appeal filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico Re: #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court re: Notice of Docket Text Modification, #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico. (Blay-Soler, Valerie) Modified caps lock on 7/30/2019 (idg).
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance Carolina Velaz-Rivero by Carolina Velaz-Rivero on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Velaz-Rivero, Carolina)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance Luis C. Marini-Biaggi by Luis C. Marini-Biaggi on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Marini-Biaggi, Luis)
July 19, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #7 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
July 19, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #6 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance Carolina Velaz Rivero by Carolina Velaz-Rivero on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Velaz-Rivero, Carolina) Modified to file in error on 7/24/2019 (idg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR - Lacking electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b. Counsel to re-file.*** NOTICE of Appearance Luis Marini Biaggi by Luis C. Marini-Biaggi on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Marini-Biaggi, Luis) Modified to file in error on 7/24/2019 (idg).
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Intent to Respond filed by Valerie M. Blay-Soler on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, FirstBank Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Banco Santander de Puerto Rico Responses due by 7/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blay-Soler, Valerie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court re: Notice of Docket Text Modification, #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 7/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s)[], #3 ) (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court. ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number. To be re-filed.*** (idg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR - Wrong Case Number. To be re-filed.*** Emergency MOTION to Stay proceedings before the Bankruptcy Court filed by Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo on behalf of Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC Responses due by 7/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) Modified to file in error on 7/15/2019 (idg).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Certified Docket_Part1, #3 Certified Docket_Part2)(babk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC v. Betterecycling Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Betterecycling Corporation
Represented By: Wigberto Lugo-Mender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Valerie M. Blay-Soler
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FirstBank Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Valerie M. Blay-Soler
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Banco Santander de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Valerie M. Blay-Soler
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Valerie M. Blay-Soler
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?