Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc. et al v. Cestero-Lopategui et al
Plaintiff: Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc., Ana Salgado-Micheo and Victor J. Salgado-Micheo
Defendant: Javier Rivera-Rios, Juan Moldes-Rodriguez, Rafael Cestero-Lopategui and Alexander Adams
Case Number: 3:2019cv01663
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/4/2019. (AGF)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translation are due on or before October 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/4/2019. (AGF)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of Alexander Adams, Rafael Cestero-Lopategui, Juan Moldes-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios Responses due by 9/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and for extension of time to submit certified translations filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of Alexander Adams, Rafael Cestero-Lopategui, Juan Moldes-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios Responses due by 9/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of Alexander Adams, Rafael Cestero-Lopategui, Juan Moldes-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios Responses due by 9/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Court Order Granting Marshals Assistance, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rehabilitation Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Court Order (asset possession), #4 Exhibit 4 - Court Minute, #5 Exhibit 5 - Insurance Code Provisions)(Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Denying #9 Motion requesting Order without prejudice in light of the extension of time to answer or move for dismissal at Docket No. 7. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/23/2019. (LE)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (Docket No. 10), this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to the docket of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Signed by Clerk on 08/22/2019. (ft)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Upon attaining senior status, Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory no longer accept cases where injunctive relief is being sought. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/22/2019.(su)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION requesting Order Motion for Rule 16 Conference filed by Damian R. LaPlaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (LaPlaca, Damian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Antonio Fuste on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fuste, Jose) Modified on 8/9/2019 to remove restrictions, inadvertently placed. (mg).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Answer (or pleading) due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/1/2019. (JG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until September 2, 2019 to file dispositive motion or answer filed by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of Alexander Adams, Rafael Cestero-Lopategui, Juan Moldes-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios Responses due by 8/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR***COUNSEL FILED USING ANOTHER COUNSEL LOGIN & PASSWORD*** NOTICE of Appearance by Damian R. LaPlaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LaPlaca, Damian) Modified on 8/7/2019 to add *filed in error* (xi).
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement byAna Salgado-Micheo, Victor J. Salgado-Micheo, Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc. for Ana Salgado-Micheo, Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc., Victor J. Salgado-Micheo.. (LaPlaca, Damian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alexander Adams, Rafael Cestero-Lopategui, Juan Moldes-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rafael Cestero-Lopategui, Juan Moldes-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6493749.), filed by Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc., Ana Salgado-Micheo, Victor J. Salgado-Micheo. Service due by 10/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons)(LaPlaca, Damian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc. et al v. Cestero-Lopategui et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Rivera-Rios
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Moldes-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Cestero-Lopategui
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Adams
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor J. Salgado and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Damian R. LaPlaca
Represented By: Jose Antonio Fuste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Salgado-Micheo
Represented By: Damian R. LaPlaca
Represented By: Jose Antonio Fuste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor J. Salgado-Micheo
Represented By: Damian R. LaPlaca
Represented By: Jose Antonio Fuste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?