ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC v. Bonilla-Ozoria
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC
Defendant: Domingo Antonio Bonilla-Ozoria
Case Number: 3:2019cv01665
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to to hire legal representation filed by Domingo Antonio Bonilla-Ozoria, Pro Se Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mcm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC upon Domingo Antonio Bonilla-Ozoria served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Domingo Antonio Bonilla-Ozoria (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Domingo Antonio Bonilla-Ozoria ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6494449.), filed by ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC. Service due by 10/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC v. Bonilla-Ozoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Antonio Bonilla-Ozoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?