Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Montalvo-Alvarez et al
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Magaly Vega-Ramos, Conjugal Partnershipo Montalvo-Vega and Richard Montalvo-Alvarez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01666
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Richard Montalvo-Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's #5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Summons is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall issue amended summons to defendant Richard Montalvo-Alvarez FORTHWITH. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/29/19.(JWS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Magaly Vega Ramos by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company upon Magaly Vega-Ramos served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Tejeda-Oyola, Edna)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Conjugal Parnerhip Montalvo-Vega by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company upon Conjugal Partnershipo Montalvo-Vega served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Tejeda-Oyola, Edna)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Summons Re: #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER filed by Edna M. Tejeda-Oyola on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER Responses due by 7/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Corrected Richard Montalvo Alvarez)(Related document(s) #4 , #1 ) (Tejeda-Oyola, Edna)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnershipo Montalvo-Vega, Richard Montalvo-Alvarez, Magaly Vega-Ramos (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6494949.) re #1 Complaint,, filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER, filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER.(Tejeda-Oyola, Edna)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Montalvo-Alvarez, filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER. Service due by 10/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Endorsed Mortgage Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage Deed, #3 Exhibit Title Report, #4 Exhibit Pay off Quote, #5 Exhibit Default letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Sheet, #8 Summons Richard Montalvo Alvarez, #9 Summons Magaly Vega Ramos, #10 Summons Conjugal Partnership Montalvo Vega)(Tejeda-Oyola, Edna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Montalvo-Alvarez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magaly Vega-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnershipo Montalvo-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Montalvo-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORARTION AS SERVICER
Represented By: Edna M. Tejeda-Oyola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Edna M. Tejeda-Oyola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?