Punta Lima, LLC v. Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Punta Lima, LLC
Defendant: Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01673
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re #47 Motion to Restrict: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2019. (brc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Restrict Document Dkt. 44 filed by Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico on behalf of Punta Lima Development Company, LLC Responses due by 9/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pabon-Rico, Gustavo)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/10/2019. (brc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #42 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/10/2019. (brc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 44 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2019 to File Answer re: 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Punta Lima, LLC filed by Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 18 , #9 ) (Pabon-Rico, Gustavo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 43 APPROVED BOND in the amount of $4,700,000.00 posted by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC. Signed by US District Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (In Vault) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ab)
September 9, 2019 Filing 42 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Posting of Bond. filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC, Punta Lima, LLC Responses due by 9/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Plaintiff shall deposit Bond in Court. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/6/2019.(AA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION Submitting supplemental filing to Docket No. 39 re: #39 MOTION Submitting Status Report and Request for Telephonic Hearing re: 36 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 38 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #33 Order on Motion for TRO,, Motion In Compliance filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC., Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC , Punta Lima Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul) Modified on 9/9/2019 to add filers (gmm).
September 6, 2019 Filing 39 Joint MOTION Submitting Status Report and Request for Telephonic Hearing re: 36 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 38 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #33 Order on Motion for TRO,,, Motion In Compliance filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC., Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC , Punta Lima Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 36 , 38 , #33 ) (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul) Modified on 9/9/2019 to add filers (gmm).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/6/2019. (AA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for extension of time until 09/06/19 at 4:00PM to file Agreement or Status Report filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC., Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC , Punta Lima Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel) Modified on 9/9/2019 to add filers (gmm).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for extension of time Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/6/2019. (AA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for extension of time until 09/06/19 to file Agreement or Status Report filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC., Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC , Punta Lima Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel) Modified on 9/9/2019 to add filers (gmm).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re. #32 Motion for Leave to File is MOOT. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/5/2019. (AA)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER: The motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED . (Docket No. 26.) The parties shall inform the Court of the time and manner in which the plaintiffs may access the facility on September 9, 2019 no later than 1:00 PM on September 6, 2019 . Punta Lima and Wind Farm are allowed until September 23, 2019 to file amended complaints in accordance with this opinion and order. Failure to do so may entail the dismissal of the complaints. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 23, 2019 Letter) (AA) Modified on 9/6/2019 to edit title (ab).
September 5, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Document - Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 26) filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC, Punta Lima, LLC Responses due by 9/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Reply))(Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
September 5, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion - Reply to Brief Response to Plaintiffs' "Urgent Motion Informing Plaintiff's Consent to Consolidation and Further Requesting Immediate Consolidation" (DKT. 24) and to Plaintiffs' "Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order" (DKT. 26) filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC, Punta Lima, LLC Re: #26 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC, Punta Lima, LLC. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re. #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: GRANTED.Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/5/2019. (AA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Punta Lima Development Company, LLC Re: #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Punta Lima, LLC, #26 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC filed by Punta Lima Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Pabon-Rico, Gustavo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
September 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order Granting Emergency TRO by Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC re #26 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
September 4, 2019 Filing 26 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Punta Lima Lease), #2 Exhibit 2 (Punta Lima Lessor Consent), #3 Exhibit 3 (Montida Lease, #4 Exhibit 4 (Assignment Montida Lease), #5 Exhibit 5 (Montida Sublease), #6 Exhibit 6 (Montida Sublessor Consent), #7 Exhibit 7 (Torres-Hoyos), #8 Exhibit 8 (Assignment Torres-Hoyos Lease), #9 Exhibit 9 (Torres-Hoyos Sublease), #10 Exhibit 10 (Torres-Hoyos Sublessor Consent), #11 Exhibit 11 (Facility Lease), #12 Exhibit 12 (Subordination Agreement), #13 Exhibit 13 (Deed of Amendment to Sublease Torres-Hoyos), #14 Exhibit 14 (Deed of Amendment to Sublease Montida), #15 Exhibit 15 (First Ext. Facility Lease Ag.), #16 Exhibit 16 (PPOA), #17 Exhibit 17 (Ext. PPOA), #18 Exhibit 18 (Insurance Policy), #19 Exhibit 19 (Seventh Ext. Facility Lease Ag.), #20 Exhibit 20 (May 9 NoD Punta Lima), #21 Exhibit 21 (May 31 NoD Montida), #22 Exhibit 22 (May 31 Torres-Hoyos), #23 Exhibit 23 (June 24 NoD Punta Lima), #24 Exhibit 24 (June 24 NoD Montida), #25 Exhibit 25 (June 24 NoD Torres-Hoyos), #26 Exhibit 26 (Table), #27 Exhibit 27 (Letter re: Business Interruption), #28 Exhibit 28 (First NoD Facility Lease Ag.), #29 Exhibit 29 (Second NoD Facility lease Ag.), #30 Exhibit 30 (Foreclosure Agreement), #31 Exhibit 31 (July 18 Letter re: Site Visit), #32 Exhibit 32 (July 19 Letter re: Site Visit), #33 Exhibit 33 (Notices of Termiantion), #34 Exhibit 34 (Participation Agreement), #35 Exhibit 35 (Sample WTCs), #36 Exhibit 36 (Barr Engineering Contract), #37 Exhibit 37 (Verified Complaint in PLWF Case), #38 Affidavit Sworn Declaration from C. Atlamazoglou)(Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER #21 Motion to Consolidate Cases and #24 Motion to Consolidate Cases GRANTED.Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/4/2019. (AA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Notice (Other): NOTED. A response will be filed no later than September 6, 2019. No extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/03/2019. (brc)
September 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Intent to Respond to Motion to Consolidate Cases by Punta Lima, LLC re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico on behalf of Punta Lima Development Company, LLC Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pabon-Rico, Gustavo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez on behalf of Punta Lima Development Company, LLC (Escalera-Rodriguez, Rafael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Punta Lima Development Company, LLC (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer : GRANTED. Answer to complaint shall be filed no later than September 12, 2019. A response to the motion for preliminary injunction shall also be filed no later than September 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 8/14/2019. (grf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPunta Lima Development Company, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Gestamp Wind San Juan, Inc., Other Affiliate Orozco Development, Corp. for Punta Lima Development Company, LLC.. (Pabon-Rico, Gustavo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 12, 2019 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Punta Lima, LLC filed by Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico on behalf of Punta Lima Development Company, LLC Responses due by 8/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Pabon-Rico, Gustavo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC (Cortes-Ruiz, Paul)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/05/2019. (brc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC (Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Motion for a Status Quo Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC Responses due by 8/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Text of Proposed Order)(Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Document in excess of page limit filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC Responses due by 8/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: This case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Upon attaining senior status, Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory does not accept cases where injunctive relief is sought. Accordingly, Judge Garcia-Gregory is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 07/29/2019. (gr)
July 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC Responses due by 8/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Punta Lima, LLC upon Punta Lima Development Company, LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
July 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Punta Lima, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Plaintiff's Informative Motion: Noted. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/19/2019. (JG)
July 16, 2019 DEPOSIT of Funds in the amount of $ 782,998.00, receipt number PRX100064889.(RE.DKT:2)To be deposited on the next working day in an interest bearing account in compliance with L.Cv.R. 67. **FUNDS WILL BE AVAILABLE FOR DISBURSEMENT AFTER 7 WORKING DAYS** (arg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Punta Lima Development Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPunta Lima, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Punta Lima, LLC for Punta Lima, LLC.. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Consignation of Funds. filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Punta Lima, LLC Responses due by 7/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Punta Lima Development Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6497813.), filed by Punta Lima, LLC. Service due by 10/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Civil Cover Sheet, #21 Category Sheet, #22 Summons)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Punta Lima, LLC v. Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Punta Lima, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo
Represented By: Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Punta Lima Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Gustavo Adolfo Pabon-Rico
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Punta Lima Wind Farm, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Paul A. Cortes-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?