Xerox Corporation v. Rosario-Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Defendant: Jane Doe, Their Conjugal Partnership, Rosario Sign, Inc., Pedro T. Rosario-Gonzalez and Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv01674
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) as to Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Doe, Jane Doe, Pedro T. Rosario-Gonzalez filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Xerox Corporation Responses due by 9/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Summons Returned Executed. ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect PDF. Counsel already re-filed.*** (rom)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation upon Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Doe served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation upon Jane Doe served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Pedro T. Rosario Gonzalez by Xerox Corporation upon (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect PDF.*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation upon Pedro T. Rosario-Gonzalez served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto) Modified on 8/9/2019 (rom).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Doe, Jane Doe, Pedro T. Rosario-Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, Rosario Sign, Inc., Pedro T. Rosario-Gonzalez, Their Conjugal Partnership ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6498909.), filed by Xerox Corporation. Service due by 10/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lease Agreement 2, #3 Summons Summons Pedro T. Rosario d/b/a Sign, Inc., #4 Summons Summons Jane Doe wife of Pedro T. Rosario d/b/a Sign, Inc., #5 Summons Summons Conjugal Legal Partnership, #6 Category Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xerox Corporation v. Rosario-Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Their Conjugal Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosario Sign, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro T. Rosario-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?