USA v. $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv01677
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Warrant in Rem Issued to arrest property as to $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant In Rem) (rim)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay pending resolution of related criminal case. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/30/2019. (MES)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/30/2019. (MES)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/30/2019. (MES)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (ad)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION to Restrict Document by USA. (Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by USA. Service due by 10/15/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Hector Ramirez-Carbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?