DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. v. Ayala-Perez et al
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc.
Defendant: Ana Maria Garcia Arroyo, JOSE ORLANDO AYALA-PEREZ, Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Garcia, Ana M. Garcia Arroyo, United States of America and Jose O. Ayala-Perez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01696
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. upon Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Garcia served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Perez-Gonzalez, Mariceli)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. upon Jose Orlando Ayala-Perez served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Perez-Gonzalez, Mariceli)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jose Orlando Ayala-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Garcia, Ana Maria Garcia Arroyo, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Orlando Ayala-Perez, Ana Maria Garcia Arroyo ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6507238.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc.. Service due by 10/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage Deed, #3 Exhibit Allonge and Mortgage Modification, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons ANA, #7 Summons JOSE, #8 Summons USA, #9 Summons CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP)(Perez-Gonzalez, Mariceli) Modified on 7/23/2019 to remove caps (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. v. Ayala-Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Maria Garcia Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE ORLANDO AYALA-PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Ayala-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana M. Garcia Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose O. Ayala-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc.
Represented By: Mariceli Perez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?