ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC v. Ramos-Martinez
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC
Defendant: Carmen Lydia Ramos-Martinez and Carmen L. Ramos-Martinez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01699
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Entry of Default. Plaintiff shall move for judgment within 30 days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/19/2019. (CRH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Entry as to Carmen Lydia Ramos-Martinez filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC upon Carmen Lydia Ramos-Martinez served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carmen Lydia Ramos-Martinez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carmen Lydia Ramos-Martinez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6507619.), filed by ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC. Service due by 10/21/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC v. Ramos-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACM CDGY VI LN CFL LLC
Represented By: Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Lydia Ramos-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen L. Ramos-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?