Johnson v. Rolon et al
Plaintiff: Obe E. Johnson
Defendant: Luis A Ocasio-Montanez and Erick Rolon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01720
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Denying #10 Motion to transfer case. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/4/2019. (AGF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to transfer all proceedings to another District Court filed by Obe E. Johnson, Pro se. Responses due by 9/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(gmm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Liza L. Rosado-Rodriguez on behalf of Obe E. Johnson (Rosado-Rodriguez, Liza)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Denying #6 Motion to transfer case. None of the reasons to transfer the case to another district are present. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/5/2019. (AGF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to transfer case to another District Court filed by Obe E. Johnson, Pro se. Responses due by 8/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (gmm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This complaint seeks habeas relief, to wit from state custody, even though filed as a section 1983 claim. As such the Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent defendant and shall file any appropriate pleadings if warranted, if there is indeed jurisdiction to entertain the matter. Otherwise, the FPD shall so inform the Court within 60 days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/29/2019.(MET)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/29/2019. (MET)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Luis A Ocasio-Montanez, Erick Rolon, filed by Obe E. Johnson, Pro Se. Service due by 10/24/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Obe E. Johnson, Pro Se. (ad)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Obe E. Johnson, Pro Se. Responses due by 8/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Rolon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obe E. Johnson
Represented By: Liza L. Rosado-Rodriguez
Represented By: Eric A. Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A Ocasio-Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Rolon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?