Corts-Luna v. Bristol Myers Squibb Manufacturing Company et al
Plaintiff: William Corts-Luna and William Cortes-Luna
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb Manufacturing Company, Bristol Myers Squibb Company PR, Inc. and Bristol Myers Squibb Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01721
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Carl E. Schuster on behalf of Defendants Bristol Myers Squibb Manufacturing Company, Bristol Myers Squibb Puerto Rico, Inc..(Schuster, Carl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 First INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion to Join Legal Representation filed by Marta M. Villares-Seneriz on behalf of William Cortes-Luna Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Villares-Seneriz, Marta)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl E. Schuster on behalf of All Defendants (Schuster, Carl)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by William Cortes-Luna. Answer deadline due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 8/27/2019. (jg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 26, 2019 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gorbea-Del Valle, Andres)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bristol Myers Squibb Manufacturing Company, Bristol Myers Squibb Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6515340.), filed by William Corts-Luna. Service due by 10/24/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Bristol Mfg, #4 Summons Summons Bristol PR)(Perez-Caballero, Fredeswin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corts-Luna v. Bristol Myers Squibb Manufacturing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Corts-Luna
Represented By: Fredeswin Perez-Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cortes-Luna
Represented By: Fredeswin Perez-Caballero
Represented By: Marta M. Villares-Seneriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Represented By: Carl E. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb Company PR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Myers Squibb Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Andres C. Gorbea-Del Valle
Represented By: Carl E. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?