United States of America v. Santiago-Gonzalez
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Evelyn Santiago Gonzalez and Evelyn Santiago-Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01722
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/30/2019.(LMR)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: #2 "Stipulation for Consent Judgment." The Stipulation for Consent Judgment (Docket No. 2-A) is APPROVED. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/30/2019.(LMR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION for Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Settlement Agreement) (Matos, Jorge)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Consent Judgment against Evelyn Santiago Gonzalez, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/24/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Matos, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Santiago-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Santiago Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Santiago-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jorge L. Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?