Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Ortiz-De Leon et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES 2017-1, BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION AS SERVICER and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: CARMEN L LOPEZ MORALES, EDUARDO ORTIZ DE LEON, Eduardo Ortiz-De Leon, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Lopez and Carmen L. Lopez-Morales
Case Number: 3:2019cv01733
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Lopez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Summons PROPOSED SUMMONS) (Palumbo, Shirley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carmen L. Lopez-Morales, Eduardo Ortiz-De Leon (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carmen L. Lopez-Morales, Eduardo Ortiz-De Leon ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6523501.), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Service due by 10/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Note, #4 Exhibit Mortgage, #5 Exhibit Loan Modification, #6 Exhibit SCRA, #7 Exhibit Sworn Statement, #8 Summons)(Palumbo, Shirley) Modified on 8/2/2019 to remove caps (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Ortiz-De Leon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN L LOPEZ MORALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDUARDO ORTIZ DE LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Ortiz-De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen L. Lopez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS CERTIFICATE TRUSTEE OF BOSCO CREDIT II TRUST SERIES 2017-1, BY FRANKLIN CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION AS SERVICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Shirley Ann Palumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?