Rodriguez-Rosa v. Jet Blue Airways Corp.
Plaintiff: Nidza M. Rodriguez-Rosa
Defendant: Jet Blue Airways Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01736
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jet Blue Airways Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 8/15/2019 to correct docket text (gmm).
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons) (Olmo-Rodriguez, Jose)
August 2, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt number PRX100065172 (arg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nidza M. Rodriguez-Rosa. Service due by 10/30/2019,(Olmo-Rodriguez, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Rosa v. Jet Blue Airways Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Blue Airways Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nidza M. Rodriguez-Rosa
Represented By: Jose R. Olmo-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?