***DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE- LEAD CASE IS NOW CIVIL NO. 19-1481 GAG***
Plaintiff: Asociacion Cultural y Deportiva del Gallo Fino de Pelea, John J. Olivares Yace, Angel Manuel Ortiz Diaz, Jose Miguel Cedeno, Angel Luis Narvaez Rodriguez, John J. Olivares-Yace, Angel Luis Narvaez-Rodriguez and Angel Manuel Ortiz-Diaz
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Sonny Purdue, Donald Trump, William P. Barr, United States of America and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2019cv01739
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Because both cases have been consolidated into the lead case (19-cv-1481), defendants are considered duly served in both cases. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/5/2019. (gr)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Court hereby CONSOLIDATES Civil Cases 19-1481(GAG) and 19- 1739(GAG) for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/5/2019. (gmm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Sonny Purdue, Donald Trump, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Justice, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6524297.), filed by John J. Olivares Yace, Angel Manuel Ortiz Diaz, Asociacion Cultural y Deportiva del Gallo Fino de Pelea, Angel Luis Narvaez Rodriguez, Jose Miguel Cedeno. Service due by 10/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Prado-Galarza, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ***DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE- LEAD CASE IS NOW CIVIL NO. 19-1481 GAG***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asociacion Cultural y Deportiva del Gallo Fino de Pelea
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Olivares Yace
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Manuel Ortiz Diaz
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Miguel Cedeno
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Narvaez Rodriguez
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Olivares-Yace
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Luis Narvaez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Manuel Ortiz-Diaz
Represented By: Edwin Prado-Galarza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?