Lime Residential, Ltd. v. Pepin-Gomez
Plaintiff: Lime Residential, Ltd.
Defendant: Manuel De Jesus Pepin Gomez and Manuel De Jesus Pepin-Gomez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01742
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER noted #5 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/30/2019. (EA)
September 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Submitting Non Military Affidavit filed by Andres Saez-Marrero on behalf of Lime Residential, Ltd. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SCRA)(Saez-Marrero, Andres)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lime Residential, Ltd. upon Manuel De Jesus Pepin-Gomez served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Saez-Marrero, Andres)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Manuel De Jesus Pepin Gomez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manuel De Jesus Pepin Gomez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6525258.), filed by Lime Residential, Ltd.. Service due by 10/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Internal Loan Modification, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saez-Marrero, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lime Residential, Ltd. v. Pepin-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lime Residential, Ltd.
Represented By: Andres Saez-Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel De Jesus Pepin Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel De Jesus Pepin-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?