Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Santos-Maldonado et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1 and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Edward Santos Maldonado, selenia torres santos, Conjugal Partnership Santos- Torres, Edward Santos-Maldonado, Luz Selenia Torres-Santos, Luz S. Torres-Santos and Eduard Santos-Maldonado
Case Number: 3:2019cv01747
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB upon All Defendants served on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons summons Executed Edward Santos, #2 Summons Summons executed Conjugal partnership by Edward Santos, #3 Summons Summons executed Conjugal partnership by Luz Selenia Torres, #4 Summons Summons executed Luz S. Torres) (Perez-Gonzalez, Mariceli) Modified to add service date on 8/26/2019 (idg).
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Santos- Torres, Edward Santos Maldonado, Luz Selenia TorreS-Santos (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified to correct name on 8/26/2019 (idg).
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edward Santos Maldonado, selenia torres santos ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6526318.), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Service due by 10/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit I-Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit II- Mortgage Deed, #3 Exhibit Exhibit III- Modification Deed, #4 Exhibit Exhibit IV- Internal Modification, #5 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons Conjugal Partnership, #8 Summons Summons Luz Selenia Torres, #9 Summons Summons Edward Santos Maldonado)(Perez-Gonzalez, Mariceli) Modified on 8/5/2019 to correct Plaintiff's name(mcm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Santos-Maldonado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, AS IDENTURE TRUSTEE, FOR THE CSMC 2015-PR1 TRUST, MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2015-PR1
Represented By: Mariceli Perez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Mariceli Perez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Santos Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: selenia torres santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Santos- Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Santos-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Selenia Torres-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz S. Torres-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduard Santos-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?