Ortiz v. Hospital Menonita Cima et al
Plaintiff: Juan M. Ortiz
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC, John Doe, Hospital Menonita Cima and XYZ Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01750
Filed: August 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hospital Menonita Cima (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Exhibits re Summons as to Hospital Menonita Cima filed by Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis) Modified on 9/25/2019 to edit docket title (rom).
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon.(Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0104-6526496) (arg)
August 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Juan M. Ortiz. Service due by 11/1/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis) Modified on 8/5/2019 to edit docket text (rom).
August 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance and Other Matters (Complaint) by Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Appendix Complaint, #2 Appendix ECF Payment) (Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Hospital Menonita Cima et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Menonita Cima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan M. Ortiz
Represented By: Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?