MTGLQ Investors, LP v. Estevez Leon et al
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, LP
Defendant: United States of America, Patricio Atilio Estevez Leon, CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP ESTEVEZ-POSADA, MARIA TERESA POSADA MELHADO, Patricio Atilio Estevez-Leon, Maria Teresa Posada-Melhado, Patricio A. Estevez-Leon, Conjugal Partnership Estevez-Posada and Maria Teresa Posada-De Estevez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01758
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons by Publication issued as to Conjugal Partnership Estevez-Posada, Patricio Atilio Estevez-Leon, Maria Teresa Posada-Melhado. (Attachments: #1 Summons By publication) (vdm)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/17/2019. (AGF)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Conjugal Partnership Estevez-Posada, Patricio Atilio Estevez-Leon, Maria Teresa Posada-Melhado filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of MTGLQ Investors, LP Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order, #3 Summons Sum by Publication)(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MTGLQ Investors, LP upon United States of America served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons in a Civil Action Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Estevez-Posada, Patricio Atilio Estevez-Leon, Maria Teresa Posada-Melhado (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/8/2019. (LE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Conjugal Partnership Estevez-Posada, Patricio Atilio Estevez-Leon, Maria Teresa Posada-Melhado filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of MTGLQ Investors, LP Responses due by 8/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP ESTEVEZ-POSADA, Patricio Atilio Estevez Leon, MARIA TERESA POSADA MELHADO, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (ad)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP ESTEVEZ-POSADA, Patricio Atilio Estevez Leon, MARIA TERESA POSADA MELHADO, United States of America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6529668.), filed by MTGLQ Investors, LP. Service due by 11/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Maria, #6 Summons Patricio, #7 Summons Conjugal, #8 Summons United States)(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTGLQ Investors, LP v. Estevez Leon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio Atilio Estevez Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP ESTEVEZ-POSADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA TERESA POSADA MELHADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio Atilio Estevez-Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Teresa Posada-Melhado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio A. Estevez-Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Estevez-Posada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Teresa Posada-De Estevez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, LP
Represented By: Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?