Union de Empleados de la Corporacion del Fondo del Seguro del Estado v. State Insurance Fund et al
Plaintiff: Union de Empleados de la Corporacion del Fondo del Seguro del Estado
Defendant: Marta R. Ramos-Santiago, Roberto Delgado-Cortes, Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa, Noema Giralt-Armada, Javier Rivera Rios, Briseida Torres, State Insurance Fund, Rafael Rodriguez-Mercado, ABC Insurance and Manuel Gonzalez-Del Toro
Case Number: 3:2019cv01764
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/8/2019. (AGF)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 28, 2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Stuart A. Weinstein-Bacal on behalf of Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa, State Insurance Fund Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Weinstein-Bacal, Stuart)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting #17 Motion to clarify; Granting as requested #17 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/7/2019. (AGF)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Clarify Legal Representation, MOTION for extension of time until October 24, 2019 to Answer the verified complaint or otherwise plead filed by Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez on behalf of Roberto Delgado-Cortes, Noema Giralt-Armada, Manuel Gonzalez-Del Toro, Marta R. Ramos-Santiago, Javier Rivera Rios, Rafael Rodriguez-Mercado, Briseida Torres Responses due by 10/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vargas-Lopez, Francisco)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting as requested #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/16/2019. (AGF)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting as requested #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/16/2019. (AGF)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/16/2019. (CRH)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/16/2019. (CRH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Weinstein-Bacal on behalf of Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa, State Insurance Fund (Weinstein-Bacal, Stuart)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Miller on behalf of Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa, State Insurance Fund (Miller, Peter)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Myriam C. Ocasio-Arana on behalf of Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa (Ocasio-Arana, Myriam) Modified on 9/10/2019 to correct event and edit title (gmm).
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Myriam C. Ocasio-Arana on behalf of State Insurance Fund (Ocasio-Arana, Myriam) Modified on 9/10/2019 to correct event type and edit title (gmm).
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of time to Answer the Verified Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez on behalf of Javier Rivera Ros, Roberto Delgado Corts, Manuel Gonzlez del Toro, Marta R. Ramos Santiago, Noema Giralt, Rafael Rodrguez Mercado, Briseida Torres and State Insurance Fund Corporation (Vargas-Lopez, Francisco) Modified on 9/10/2019 to replace all caps text and edit names as to whom the Notice of Appearance applies to. (mg). Modified on 9/10/2019 to correct event type and title (gmm).
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time until October 24, 2019 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Roberto Delgado-Cortes, Noema Giralt-Armada, Manuel Gonzalez-Del Toro, Marta R. Ramos-Santiago, Javier Rivera Rios, Rafael Rodriguez-Mercado, Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa, Briseida Torres Responses due by 9/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit title (gmm).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Roberto Delgado-Cortes served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Noema Giralt-Armada served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Manuel Gonzalez-Del Toro served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Marta R. Ramos-Santiago served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Javier Rivera Rios served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Rafael Rodriguez-Mercado served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; State Insurance Fund served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Briseida Torres served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Roberto Delgado-Cortes, Noema Giralt-Armada, Manuel Gonzalez-Del Toro, Marta R. Ramos-Santiago, Javier Rivera Rios, Rafael Rodriguez-Mercado, Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa, State Insurance Fund, Briseida Torres. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/13/2019. (LE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Roberto Delgado-Cortes, Noema Giralt-Armada, Manuel Gonzalez-Del Toro, Marta R. Ramos-Santiago, Javier Rivera Rios, Rafael Rodriguez-Mercado, Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa, State Insurance Fund, Briseida Torres filed by Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons State Insurance Fund, formally known as Corporacin del Fondo del Seguro del Estado (or CFSE for its Spanish acronym), #2 Summons Jess M. Rodrguez Rosa, Administrator of the CFSE, #3 Summons Javier Rivera Ros, President of the CFSE- Board, #4 Summons Dr. Rafael Rodrguez Mercado, VicePresident of the CFSE-Board, #5 Summons Briseida Torres, Esq., #6 Summons Roberto Delgado Corts, M.D., CFSE-Board Secretary, #7 Summons Noema Giralt Armada, Esq. CFSE-Board Member representing the CFSE-Employees, #8 Summons Marta R. Ramos Santiago, Esq., CFSE-Board Member, #9 Summons Manuel Gonzlez del Toro, Esq. Director of the Corporate Reform, Member of the Counseling Authority)(Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (ad)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6536251.), filed by Union-CFSE (Union-State Insurance Fund). Service due by 11/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement Under Penalty Of Perjury, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Valenzuela-Alvarado, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union de Empleados de la Corporacion del Fondo del Seguro del Estado v. State Insurance Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marta R. Ramos-Santiago
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Delgado-Cortes
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus M. Rodriguez-Rosa
Represented By: Stuart A. Weinstein-Bacal
Represented By: Myriam C. Ocasio-Arana
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Represented By: Peter W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noema Giralt-Armada
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Rivera Rios
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briseida Torres
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Insurance Fund
Represented By: Stuart A. Weinstein-Bacal
Represented By: Myriam C. Ocasio-Arana
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Peter W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Rodriguez-Mercado
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Gonzalez-Del Toro
Represented By: Francisco A. Vargas-Lopez
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union de Empleados de la Corporacion del Fondo del Seguro del Estado
Represented By: Jose Enrico Valenzuela-Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?