DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Rodriguez-Miret et al
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Defendant: CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-MIRET, JOSEFINA DELGADO PEREZ, LUIS RUBEN RODRIGUEZ MIRET, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Delgado, Luis Ruben Rodriguez-Miret and Josefina Delgado-Perez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01768
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION requesting Order filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 10/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Delgado, Josefina Delgado-Perez, Luis Ruben Rodriguez-Miret (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-MIRET, JOSEFINA DELGADO PEREZ, LUIS RUBEN RODRIGUEZ MIRET ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6536836.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet)(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Rodriguez-Miret et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Represented By: Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP RODRIGUEZ-MIRET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEFINA DELGADO PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS RUBEN RODRIGUEZ MIRET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Ruben Rodriguez-Miret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josefina Delgado-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?