Colon-Perez et al v. Rivera-Rios et al
Plaintiff: Ivan Colon-Perez, Marisol Piquer-Merino, Graciela Estarellas-Sabater, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Estarellas and Constellation Health, LLC
Defendant: Jane Doe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Rosario, Javier Rivera-Rios, John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Doe and Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01775
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Emergency MOTION Requesting that Preliminary Injunction Hearing be Vacated. The hearing set for 10/10/2019 is vacated, and will be reset, if necessary, once the #21 MOTION to Dismiss is resolved. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/9/2019. (jm)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants Javier Rivera-Rios and Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez's #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Bruce McGiverin for report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/9/19.(JWS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 26 Emergency MOTION Requesting that Preliminary Injunction Hearing be Vacated for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant Rooker-Feldman Doctrine, re 14 Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,,,, filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Responses due by 10/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION Requesting that Judicial Notice be taken of the listed docketed documents, filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Responses due by 10/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER noted #17 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 8, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion for extension of time. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 8, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 Joint Motion In Compliance as to 14 Order on Motion for Hearing,,,,,,, filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Responses due by 10/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, in Compliance with 14 Order on Motion for Hearing filed by Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Fernandez Castaner, Rafael) Modified docket text and added relationship on 9/25/2019 (idg).
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Re: #17 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Meeting IN PERSON Ordered by ECF 14 filed by Conjugal Partnership Colon-Estarellas, Marisol Piquer-Merino, Constellation Health, LLC, Graciela Estarellas-Sabater, Ivan Colon-Perez filed by Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Meeting IN PERSON Ordered by ECF 14 filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email thread between counsel)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time until 9/23/2019 to properly complete and file defendants' response to Motion for Preliminary Hearing filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike and Substitute motion at Docket No. 12 with the attached motion, Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear First MOTION for extension of time until 10/7/2019 to answer or otherwise plead pursuant Local Rule 6,, filed by Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez Responses due by 9/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER noted #10 , #11 MOTION for Hearing: Defendants shall respond to the #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 9/17/2019. By 9/24/2019, the parties shall exchange copies of all exhibits they intend to introduce at a preliminary injunction hearing, and the names of all persons expected to testify as witnesses. By not later than 9/27/2019, the attorneys for the parties shall meet IN PERSON to attempt to settle this case. If no settlement is reached, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of facts by 10/4/2019. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 10/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. So ordered. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 9/6/2019. (jm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear First MOTION for extension of time until 10/7/2019 to answer or otherwise plead pursuant Local Rule 6,, filed by Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez, Javier Rivera-Rios filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance , First MOTION for extension of time until 10/7/2019 to answer or otherwise plead pursuant Local Rule 6,, filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez. Responses due by 9/19/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael) Modified title and removed event on 9/9/2019 (idg).
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Conjugal Partnership Colon-Estarellas, Marisol Piquer-Merino, Constellation Health, LLC, Graciela Estarellas-Sabater, Ivan Colon-Perez filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Conjugal Partnership Colon-Estarellas, Marisol Piquer-Merino, Constellation Health, LLC, Graciela Estarellas-Sabater, Ivan Colon-Perez filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Orlando Fernandez on behalf of Ivan Colon-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Estarellas, Graciela Estarellas-Sabater, Marisol Piquer-Merino (Fernandez, Orlando)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Javier Rivera-Rios served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (Docket No. 5), the #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction has been randomly referred within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for hearing, and Report and Recommendation. Signed by Clerk on 08/15/2019. (gr)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs on 8/13/2019 is HEREBY REFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge for a hearing and for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/15/2019. (LAD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Javier Rivera-Rios, Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6539312.), filed by Conjugal Partnership Colon-Estarellas, Graciela Estarellas-Sabater, Ivan Colon-Perez, Marisol Piquer-Merino, Constellation Health, LLC. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Javier Rivera Rios, #4 Summons Wilma Rosario Rodriguez)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon-Perez et al v. Rivera-Rios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Rivera-Rios
Represented By: Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilma Rosario-Rodriguez
Represented By: Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Colon-Perez
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Represented By: Orlando Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Piquer-Merino
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Represented By: Orlando Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Estarellas-Sabater
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Represented By: Orlando Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Colon-Estarellas
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Represented By: Orlando Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constellation Health, LLC
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?