Pejcic v. Choice Hotels International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dusica Pejcic
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc., RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC, Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel, Dr. John Doe and RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION
Not Yet Classified: Manuel R. Morales, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01777
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Referring Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: A mediation conference is set for November 21, 2019 at 2:00 pm. Principals with decision-making authority to make, accept and reject settlement offers and counteroffers shall be readily available on call for immediate consultation. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 10/7/19. (jhi)
October 7, 2019 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (Docket No. 80), the #79 MOTION to Set Mediation has been referred to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for disposition and Mediation. Signed by Clerk on 10/07/2019. (gr)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: All "Doe" defendants shall be identified with their true names by 11/6/2019; Rule 26(a)(1) mandatory disclosures shall be made by 11/8/2019; Discovery due by 2/6/2020; Pretrial/Settlement Conference SET for 4/6/2020 at 1:30 PM in Judge Carmen C. Cerezo's Chambers; Jury Trial SET for 5/8/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/7/2019. (mld)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants RC Hotel Management, RC Hospitality, Inc., and Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s #77 MOTION to Substitute Counsel is GRANTED. Plaintiff Dusica Pejcic's #79 MOTION to Set Mediation is REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for disposition and mediation. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/7/19.(JWS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Set Mediation filed by Carmen Yolanda Cartaya on behalf of Dusica Pejcic Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cartaya, Carmen)
September 17, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Setting (Status Conference) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Carmen Yolanda Cartaya on behalf of Dusica Pejcic. Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cartaya, Carmen) Modified title and event on 9/19/2019 (idg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jose A. Andreu-Collazo, MOTION to Withdraw filed by Jose A. Andreu-Collazo on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. Responses due by 9/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Andreu-Collazo, Jose). Added event on 9/17/2019 (idg).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's Dusica Pejcic's #75 Motion to allow Carmen Y. Cartaya to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100065444) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 9/5/19.(JWS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 75 Motion to allow Carmen Y. Cartaya to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100065444) filed by Francisco J. Colon-Pagan on behalf of Dusica Pejcic Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Pagan, Francisco)
August 16, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco J. Colon-Pagan on behalf of Dusica Pejcic (Colon-Pagan, Francisco)
August 15, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re: Case transferred from the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2019. (idg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 72 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-24184. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 25, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico and mark this case as CLOSED in this District. Closing Case. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting in part #62 Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court in and for Puerto Rico. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico and mark this case as CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Extend Deadlines in Court's Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule. A new scheduling order will issue separately. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline In Court's Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule filed by Dusica Pejcic. Replies due by 6/6/2019. (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 68 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline In Court's Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule by RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #31 Amended Complaint, AND IMPROPER VENUE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT IN AND FOR PUERTO RICO filed by RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #31 Amended Complaint, AND IMPROPER VENUE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT IN AND FOR PUERTO RICO filed by Dusica Pejcic. Replies due by 5/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of Stuart M. Kreindler, Esq., #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript of Rafael Mendez)(Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part #60 Motion to Compel Mediation Date. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Mediation and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc., RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. Replies due by 4/25/2019. (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE DISTRICT OF PUERTO RICO (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 62 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #31 Amended Complaint, AND IMPROPER VENUE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT IN AND FOR PUERTO RICO by RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. Responses due by 5/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER setting response deadline as to #60 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Mediation and Memorandum of Law in Support: Responses due by 4/18/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 60 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Mediation and Memorandum of Law in Support by Dusica Pejcic. Responses due by 4/29/2019 (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time for Jurisdictional Discovery. The deadline for completion of jurisdictional discovery is April 12, 2019. Defendants have until April 17, 2019 to file a combined motion under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), (3) and (6), or separate answers. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Re-Schedule Mediation Presently Set for April 25, 2019. The mediation set for April 25, 2019 is cancelled. The parties shall re-schedule the mediation after the Court rules upon the personal jurisdiction and transfer of venue issues. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline as to Jurisdictional Discovery by Dusica Pejcic. (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Continue or RE-SCHEDULE MEDIATION PRESENTLY SET FOR APRIL 25, 2019 by RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. Responses due by 4/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant, Le Consulat an Ascend Collection Hotel, is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 54 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2019 re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS #31 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. Total time in court: 11 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Carmen Yolanda Cartaya, Stephanie Kaufer. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 954-769-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ada) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION TO DISMISS #31 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dusica Pejcic. Replies due by 3/5/2019. (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #49 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant, Le Consulat's Motion to Dismiss filed by Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. Replies due by 3/5/2019. (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER setting expedited response deadline as to #49 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant, Le Consulat's Motion to Dismiss; Responses due by 2/26/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 49 Plaintiff's MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant, Le Consulat's Motion to Dismiss by Dusica Pejcic. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 47 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Discovery Hearing held on 2/15/2019, Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2019. Total time in court: 6 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Carmen Yolanda Cartaya, Stephanie Kaufer. Court Reporter: Gizella Baan-Proulx, 305-523-5634 / Gizella_Baan-Proulx@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ada) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 46 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #42 MOTION TO DISMISS #31 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2019 04:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 45 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference, re: jurisdictional discovery set for 2/15/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (re: DE #40 ). The parties shall appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. (ps1) Modified on 2/14/2019 (ps1). [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 43 Statement of: OF MATERIAL FACTS In Support of Le Consulat, An Ascend Collection Hotel's Motion for Summary Judgment by Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS #31 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. Responses due by 2/27/2019 (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by Choice Hotels International, Inc. of Joinder in Defendants' RC Hotel Management Group, Inc and RC Hospitality Corp's Motion to Transfer to the District of Puerto Rico (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #31 Amended Complaint, and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court in and for Puerto Rico by RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. Attorney Benjamin Lawrence Bedard added to party RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Lawrence Bedard added to party RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3A)(Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #31 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dusica Pejcic. RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #31 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dusica Pejcic. RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part #36 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall perfect service and file proof of service on the newly-added Defendants by February 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to perfect service on newly-added Defendants, RC Hotel Management, Inc. and RC Hospitality Corporation by Dusica Pejcic. Responses due by 2/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC. (dj) (Main Document 35 replaced on 1/17/2019) (dj). [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) directed to RC Hospitality Corporation by Dusica Pejcic (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) directed to RC Hotel Management, Inc. by Dusica Pejcic (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Manuel R. Morales, Jr. Mediation Hearing set for 4/25/2019 @ 9am. (Morales, Manuel) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 31 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Choice Hotels International, Inc., Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel, RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC, RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION, JOHN DOE filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Dusica Pejcic.(Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff must file her Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry, in accordance with the Rules, by January 10, 2019. Plaintiff must serve any newly-added Defendants on or before January 23, 2019. Thereafter, all Defendants shall file one combined response or separate answers within the time allowed the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 29 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Dusica Pejcic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Attorney Michael Jason Merrill terminated per order #28 . (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re: #24 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) Modified to reopen party 1/3/2019 (jao). [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Manuel R. Morales, Jr. Mediation Hearing set for 4/25/2019 09:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 26 AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (tb) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD by Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman added for Discovery Matters per order #23 . Judge Jonathan Goodman added (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring certain matters to Magistrate Judge: Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 10/22/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Dusica Pejcic (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Form)(Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 Statement of: Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure by Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Dusica Pejcic (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. Answer due 11/28/2018. Re: #6 Amended Complaint filed by Dusica Pejcic. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. Attorney Benjamin Lawrence Bedard added to party Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. Attorney Benjamin Lawrence Bedard added to party Choice Hotels International, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bedard, Benjamin) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Merrill, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Merrill, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Jason Merrill on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc.. Attorney Michael Jason Merrill added to party Choice Hotels International, Inc.(pty:dft). (Merrill, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel by Dusica Pejcic (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #6 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dusica Pejcic. Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #6 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dusica Pejcic. Choice Hotels International, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that on or before January 8, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendants or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Choice Hotels International, Inc., Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel, filed by Dusica Pejcic.(Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Dusica Pejcic re #4 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, of Filing Amended Complaint (Cartaya, Carmen) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff, Dusica Pejcic, shall file an amended complaint clarifying the citizenship of Defendant, Le Consulat, An Ascend Collection Hotel, aswell as the basis for personal jurisdiction, no later than 10/18/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Choice Hotels International, Inc., Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. (dj) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (dj) [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Choice Hotels International, Inc., Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11063802, payment transferred from : 1:18-cv-24182, filed by Dusica Pejcic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Choice Hotels International, Inc., #3 Summon(s) Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel)(Cartaya, Carmen) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (jc). [Transferred from flsd on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pejcic v. Choice Hotels International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Lawrence Bedard
Represented By: Michael Jason Merrill
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Represented By: Jose A. Andreu-Collazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RC HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC
Represented By: Benjamin Lawrence Bedard
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Represented By: Jose A. Andreu-Collazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Consulat An Ascend Collection Hotel
Represented By: Benjamin Lawrence Bedard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RC HOSPITALITY CORPORATION
Represented By: Benjamin Lawrence Bedard
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Represented By: Jose A. Andreu-Collazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Manuel R. Morales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dusica Pejcic
Represented By: Carmen Yolanda Cartaya
Represented By: Francisco J. Colon-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?