Garcia-Rivera v. Municipality Of Bayamon
Plaintiff: Sol M. M. Garcia-Rivera and Sol M. Garcia-Rivera
Defendant: Municipality Of Bayamn and Municipality of Bayamon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01778
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's sexual harassment claims pursuant to Title VII, Law 17, Law 100, and Law 69. The retaliation claims pursuant to Title VII and Law 17 shall remain. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/4/2019. (MQ)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. Partial Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/4/2019. (MQ)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Sol M. Garcia-Rivera Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Municipality of Bayamon filed by Sol M. Garcia-Rivera. (Quetglas, Jose)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss claims for sexual harassment under Title VII, Act 17, Act 100 and Act 69 as to Sol M. Garcia-Rivera filed by Jose F. Quetglas on behalf of Sol M. Garcia-Rivera Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas, Jose)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Claudio Aliff-Ortiz on behalf of Municipality of Bayamon Responses due by 10/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aliff-Ortiz, Claudio)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 4), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2019. (gr)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint. This case is transferred to the docket of Senior Judge Garcia-Gregory, in exchange for criminal case number 17-632. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/10/2019. (brc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Municipality of Bayamon (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Municipality Of Bayamn ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6540627.), filed by Sol M. M. Garcia-Rivera. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Quetglas, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia-Rivera v. Municipality Of Bayamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality Of Bayamn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Bayamon
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sol M. M. Garcia-Rivera
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sol M. Garcia-Rivera
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?