Pizzella v. Lionsgate Homes LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Pizzella
Defendant: Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC, Lionsgate Homes LLC and Jeremy Evans
Case Number: 3:2019cv01779
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Patrick Pizzella upon Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Wong, James) Modified on 9/27/2019 to edit docket text (ab).
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Patrick Pizzella upon Lionsgate Homes LLC served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Wong, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR. Incomplete PDF***AFFIDAVIT of Service by Patrick Pizzella upon Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Wong, James) Modified on 9/26/2019 (ab).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Wong on behalf of Patrick Pizzella (Wong, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Evans, Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC, Lionsgate Homes LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Evans, Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC, Lionsgate Homes LLC, filed by Patrick Pizzella. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(De La Paz, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizzella v. Lionsgate Homes LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionsgate Disaster Relief, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionsgate Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pizzella
Represented By: Barbara Carina De La Paz
Represented By: James R. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?