Figueroa et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: E.A.N, Dennis Figueroa, C.A.N. and Tina Cordova
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, John Doe, Richard Doe and Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Case Number: 3:2019cv01783
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C.A.N., Tina Cordova, E.A.N, Dennis Figueroa upon United States of America served on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Cancio-Biaggi, Juan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits Summons for U.S. Attorney as to United States of America filed by Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Cancio-Biaggi, Juan) Modified on 8/22/2019 to correct title(mcm).
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), US Department of Homeland Security, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6541914.), filed by Dennis Figueroa, E.A.N, C.A.N., Tina Cordova. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Summons USA, #3 Summons Homeland Security, #4 Summons FEMA, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cancio-Biaggi, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A.N
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Figueroa
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.N.
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Cordova
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?