Del Villar-Rosario v. Fernandez-Ramos et al
Plaintiff: Euripides Del Villar-Rosario
Defendant: Victor Roberto Fernandez-Ramos, Stephanie M. Fernandez, Teresa Guillen-Lugo and Primitivo Pagan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01792
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/17/2019. (lir)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding NOA and Extension of Time filed by Paul Rodriguez-Velez on behalf of Euripides Del Villar-Rosario Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Paul Rodriguez-Velez, Esq. appointed to represent Plaintiff: Euripides Del Villar-Rosario (pro-se) re D.E. 5 Order. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/19. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Euripides Del Villar-Rosario & Counsel: Paul Rodriguez-Velez, Esq., re Add and Terminate Attorneys. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/30/19.(mg)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for extension of time. Moreover, the Court hereby APPOINTS PRO BONO COUNSEL to assist Plaintiff in these proceedings. Counsel shall meet with Plaintiff to review the legal requirements of the claims filed before this Court, and provide an initial assessment of the viability of these claims. Counsel shall file an amended complaint, which shall also specify the basis for jurisdiction, by 10/30/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/30/2019. (MQ)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION requesting USM Serve Summons filed by Euripides Del Villar-Rosario, pro se. Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time filed by Euripides Del Villar-Rosario, pro se. Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Euripides Del Villar-Rosario, pro se. Service due by 11/18/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Euripides Del Villar-Rosario, pro se. Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Villar-Rosario v. Fernandez-Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Euripides Del Villar-Rosario
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Roberto Fernandez-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie M. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Guillen-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primitivo Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?