Martinez-Romero v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Alexis Martinez-Romero
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01799
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 8/27/19. (jhi)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez for final disposition as per 28 U.S.C. 636; Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; and the consent of the parties. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-1799 (MEL). Judge Daniel R. Dominguez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 08/23/2019. (ft)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for final disposition. Based upon the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636; Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; and the consent of the parties, this case is now referred to the Clerk to assign the instant matter to a Magistrate Judge at random. The Social Security Administration has consented to have all social security cases brought before a Magistrate Judge. Moreover, Plaintiff has also consented to have this case brought before a Magistrate Judge at Docket Entry 5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/23/2019.(MES)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Alexis Martinez-Romero. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Alexis Martinez-Romero (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Alexis Martinez-Romero. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Alexis Martinez-Romero. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Alexis Martinez-Romero Responses due by 9/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Romero v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Martinez-Romero
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?